Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Referred: Hal R Ray, Jr
Case #: 4:20-cv-01291
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2020
Terminated:Aug 09, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 29, 2021 3:25 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Fort Worth
Represented By
Kelly Christine Riba Albin
City Of Fort Worth
contact info
Carl Ray Qualls, III
City Of Fort Worth Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Deautric X Sims
1938 Jasmine Dr
Lancaster, TX 75146
Represented By
Benjamin Eugene Myers
My Law Firm PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Fort Worth Police Department
Terminated: 04/19/2021
Represented By
Kelly Christine Riba Albin
City Of Fort Worth
contact info
Carl Ray Qualls, III
City Of Fort Worth Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jul 09 2021
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Because Sims did not timely assert his claims under Title VII, and because he failed to state a claim upon which relief could be granted for race discrimination and retaliation, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Judge Pittman GRANT the City's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 30), and DISMISS Sims's Title VII claims with prejudice. Any party who objects to any part of these findings, conclusions, and recommendation must file specific written objections within 14 days after being served with a copy. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/9/2021) (pef)
GPO Aug 09 2021
ORDER ACCEPTING 32 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Accordingly, Defendant's Motion (ECF No. 30) is GRANTED. Therefore, the Court finds that Plaintiff's claims should be and hereby are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/9/2021) (tln)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, August 09, 2021
34 34 order Judgment Mon 08/09 10:26 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: This Judgment is issued pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). In accordance with the Order this case (ECF No.33 ): It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/9/2021) (tln)
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Mon 08/09 10:16 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING32 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Accordingly, Defendant's Motion (ECF No.30 ) is GRANTED. Therefore, the Court finds that Plaintiff's claims should be and hereby are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/9/2021) (tln)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
32 32 motion Findings and Recommendations Fri 07/09 3:56 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Because Sims did not timely assert his claims under Title VII, and because he failed to state a claim upon which relief could be granted for race discrimination and retaliation, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Judge Pittman GRANT the City's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.30 ), and DISMISS Sims's Title VII claims with prejudice. Any party who objects to any part of these findings, conclusions, and recommendation must file specific written objections within 14 days after being served with a copy. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/9/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
31 31 respm Appendix in Support Mon 05/03 1:36 PM
Appendix in Support filed by City of Fort Worth re30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Qualls, Carl)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/03 1:35 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Fort Worth with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Carl Ray Qualls, III added to party City of Fort Worth(pty:dft) (Qualls, Carl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
29 29 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 04/20 10:44 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend his complaint. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF No.28 at 1-4) shall be deemed filed on April 19, 2021. Because of the filing of the First Amended Complaint, the Court deems Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.22 ) as denied as moot. Defendant shall file its answer or other pleading or motion in response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before May 4, 2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 4/20/2021) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/19 9:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Deautric X Sims. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Myers, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Agreement to add and remove party
Monday, March 29, 2021
27 27 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/29 11:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/3/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2021. Motions due by 12/17/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/15/2021. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/29/2021) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
26 26 misc Status Report Fri 03/26 3:17 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Fort Worth Police Department. (Qualls, Carl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
25 25 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Thu 03/04 10:33 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before April 1, 2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/4/2021) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
24 24 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 02/26 9:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fort Worth Police Department. (Qualls, Carl)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Appendix in Support Fri 02/26 9:08 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Fort Worth Police Department re22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Qualls, Carl)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/26 9:05 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fort Worth Police Department with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Carl Ray Qualls, III added to party Fort Worth Police Department(pty:dft) (Qualls, Carl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
21 21 service Summons Returned Tue 02/09 12:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fort Worth Police Department; served on 2/5/2021. (mmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 02/01 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Eugene Myers on behalf of Deautric X Sims. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Myers, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 01/25 3:54 PM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: Deautric X Sims must address the following deficiency: The "Motion to Appoint Counsel" needs to be made in a written motion in proper form. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/25/2021) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
18 18 service Summons Issued Fri 01/22 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Fort Worth Police Department. (Summons, USM 285, Order16 , and Amended Complaint distributed to USMS) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
17 17 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 01/21 11:15 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Suit filed by Deautric X Sims. (Myers, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Ltr Requesting Pro Bono Appointment,
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) Request for Service of Process by US Marshall
motion Appoint Counsel Fri 01/22 9:09 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel (see doc 17-1 for image) filed by Deautric X Sims. (mmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/04 4:18 PM
ORDER: The Court has screened Plaintiff's complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) (2)(B), and the Court finds that this pleading may be served upon the Defendant. The Court DIRECTS the clerk of Court to mail one blank USM-285 form and two blank summons forms to Plaintiff. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/4/2021) (mmw)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/04 1:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Deautric X Sims. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sims, Deautric)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/04 7:16 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Deautric X Sims. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sims, Deautric)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 03, 2021
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 01/03 1:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Deautric X Sims. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sims, Deautric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
12 12 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Wed 12/16 4:05 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party,1 Judge Boyle, received back from Deautric X Sims as Return to Sender. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/04 2:30 PM
AMENDED ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/4/2020) (trt)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order And Notice of Deficiency Fri 12/04 1:43 PM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: Deautric X Sims must address the following deficiency: file an amended complaint specifying his legal claims in compliance with Rule 8(a). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 1/4/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/4/2020) (trt)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/04 1:40 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/4/2020) (trt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
8 8 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 12/04 1:30 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (mmw)
Related: [-]
7 7 qcref Pittman Thu 12/03 4:08 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Transferring to Another Division Thu 12/03 3:28 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Under the authority of Miscellaneous Order No. 6, this action is transferred to the Fort Worth Division, where venue is proper. See 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a); 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-5(f)(3); In re Horseshoe Entertainment , 337 F.3d 429, 432-33 (5th Cir. 2003) (per curiam). Plaintiff filed this pro se action against Defendant Fort Worth Police Department, claiming wrongful termination. Doc.3 . The events at issue occurred in Tarrant County, Texas, which lies within the boundaries of the Fort Worth Division. Plaintiff has alleged no events that occurred within the Dallas Division. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/3/2020) (chmb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (Public Entry) Thu 12/03 3:43 PM
New case number 4:20-cv-1291-P; Sims v. Fort Worth Police Department has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:20-cv-3507-B-BK. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (cea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Dec 1 16:12:33 CST 2020 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
5 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deautric X Sims. (hml)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deautric X Sims. (hml)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT against Fort Worth Police Department filed by Deautric X Sims. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hml)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s),
Att: 2 Additional Page(s)
2 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml)
Related: [-]
1 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
Related: [-]