North Dakota District Court
Judge:Daniel L Hovland
Referred: Clare R Hochhalter
Case #: 1:20-cv-00222
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause45:151 Railway Labor Act
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2020
Terminated:Oct 18, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 02, 2021 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant
BNSF Railway Company
Represented By
Daniel A. Haws
Hkm
contact info
Roland John Wells, III
Hkm
contact info
Andrew D. Cook
Ohnstad Twichell
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Fink
Represented By
Joseph M. Sayler
Bolt Hoffer Boyd Law Firm
contact info

GPO Dec 23 2020
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
GPO Apr 21 2023
ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 37 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (MM)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
53 53 1 pgs order Order Adopting Stipulation Wed 10/18 10:47 AM
ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting52 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by BNSF Railway Company.(JO)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 10/18 11:05 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (mf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
52 52 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/11 10:17 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BNSF Railway Company. (Wells, Roland)
Related: [-]