California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:20-mj-05181
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2020
Terminated:Dec 03, 2020
Last checked: Friday Dec 04, 2020 11:38 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
One Wiko Cell Phone, MODEL: C210AE IMEI: 52280104380292 ("Target Devicee 1") (1)
Terminated: 12/03/2020


Docket last updated: 12/05/2020 12:06 AM PST
Thursday, December 03, 2020
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to One Wiko Cell Phone, MODEL: C210AE IMEI: 52280104380292 ("Target Devicee 1"). (lrc)
Related: [-]
2 2 Search and Seizure Warrant Issued in case as to One Wiko Cell Phone, MODEL: C210AE IMEI: 52280104380292 ("Target Devicee 1"). (lrc)
Related: [-]