Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00781
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2020 1:48 AM CST
Defendant
Sean Blunt (7)
Represented By
Daniel Eli Radakovich
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Lauren Coley (5)
Represented By
Ronald J. Clark
Ronald J. Clark And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Shavon Johnson (6)
Represented By
Daniel Patrick McLaughlin
Federal Defender Program
contact info
Defendant
Janelle Jordan (4)
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Madden
Attorney At Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Nicole Lacey (2)
Represented By
Anthony R Burch
Burch & Associates
contact info
Janise Graham
Burch & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Aleesha McDowell (1)
Represented By
Jayne Anne Ingles
Jayne A. Ingles, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Stacey Sims (3)
Represented By
Quinn Alexandra Michaelis
Quinn A. Michaelis
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Pretrial Services
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Matthew Hernandez
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Mary Katherine McClelland
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 09 2020
PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/9/20.Notices mailed. (psm, )PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/9/20.Notices mailed. (psm, )PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/9/20.Notices mailed. (psm, )PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/9/20.Notices mailed. (psm, )PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/9/20.Notices mailed. (psm, )PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/9/20.Notices mailed. (psm, )PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/9/20.Notices mailed. (psm, )

Docket last updated: 12/05/2020 2:14 AM CST
Thursday, November 05, 2020
1 1 24 pgs INDICTMENT as to Aleesha McDowell (1) count(s) 1-12, 13-14, Nicole Lacey (2) count(s) 1-7, 9, 11-12, Stacey Sims (3) count(s) 8-9, Janelle Jordan (4) count(s) 3, 6, 10, Lauren Coley (5) count(s) 11-12, Shavon Johnson (6) count(s) 2, 4, 6, 8, Sean Blunt (7) count(s) 1, 3 (rp, )
Related: [-]
3 3 DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 1). (rp, )
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: To issue bench warrant as to Aleesha McDowell. Bond to be determined at arraignment. To issue bench warrants and set preliminary bail at $4,500 as to Nicole Lacey, Stacey Sims, Janelle Jordan, Shavon Johnson, and Sean Blunt. The government will issue a summons ordering defendant, Laura Coley, to appear to set preliminary bail at $4,500. Prior to sealing the indictment, the government request that one (1) copy of the arrest warrant be made available, via email, to the assistant U.S. Attorneys assigned to the case, Matthew Hernandez (matthew.hernandez@usdoj.gov) and Kate McClelland (kate.mcclelland@usdoj.gov), and to the special agent assigned to this case, Kelly Shanahan (kashanahan@fbi.gov), in order to facilitate the setting of the arraignments for all defendants. This information is to remain sealed until the arrest of all defendants, or until further order of the court. (rp, )
Related: [-]