Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 7:20-cr-00022
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2020 2:31 AM EST
Defendant
Robert Preston (1)
Represented By
Patrick E. O'Neill
Turner & O'Neill, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
R. Nicholas Rabold
U.S. Attorney'S Office - London
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/05/2020 3:09 AM EST
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Robert Preston (1). (TDA) Modified text on 10/9/2020 (TDA). (TDA). [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 UNREDACTED Affidavit of Hallie East
Att: 2 (10/9/2020) Redacted Affidavit of Hallie East
3 3 SEALED MOTION to Seal Case filed by USA re Robert Preston. (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Robert Preston: re3 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/6/2020. (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
Arrest of Robert Preston. (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
CJA Case Assignment by Clerk: APPOINTED CJA Attorney Patrick E. O'Neill for Robert Preston. cc: COR, USP, USM (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Robert Preston. (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Robert Preston. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Patrick O'Neill. (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Robert Preston. (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER as to Robert Preston re6 : the criminal complaint and redacted affidavit are UNSEALED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/9/2020. (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF FILING of Redacted Affidavit as to Robert Preston(Rabold, R.) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Preston. (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ENTRY FOR INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Robert Preston: proceedings held on 10/9/2020 before Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins; Patrick O'Neill appointed CJA counsel. DETENTION HEARING set for October 14, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. in PIKEVILLE, KY before Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Dft remanded to custody of US Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. (Tape #KYED-PIK_7-20-mj-23-01_20201009_142853) (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
11 11 ORDER as to Robert Preston: the detention hearing scheduled before undersigned for Wednesday, October 14, 2020, at 1:00 p.m., is RESCHEDULED for 2:00 p.m. on same day in Pikeville. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/14/2020. (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTE ENTRY FOR DETENTION HEARING as to Robert Preston: proceedings held on 10/14/2020 before Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins; the matter of Detention is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. An order outlining Court's specific rulings is forthcoming. Dft remanded to custody of US Marshal pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. (Tape #KYED-PIK_7-20-mj-23-01_20201014_134120) (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
13 13 WITNESS LIST re Detention Hearing held on 10/14/2020 as to Robert Preston. (TDA) [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Robert Preston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/19/2020. (TDA) cc: COR,USM,USP [7:20-mj-00023-EBA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
15 15 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Robert Preston (1) count 1 with FORFEITURE ALLEGATION. (RCB) (RCB).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/6/2020) Unredacted Indictment
17 17 MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Robert Preston. Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (RCB)
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER as to Robert Preston: re17 United States' motion for an arraignment is GRANTED, and ARRAIGNMENT set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in PIKEVILLE before Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 11/5/2020. (RCB)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]