Scovill, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:11-bk-21650
Lead case is: 2:11-bk-21650
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James R Sacca |
Case #: | 2:11-bk-21652 |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2011 |
Converted: | Jul 12, 2011 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Debtor
Scovill, Inc.
1802 Scovill Dr
Clarkesville, GA 30523-6348 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims Agent
BMC Group
444 N. Nash St.
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Spring Street, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/04/2013 2:24 AM EST |
Tuesday, April 19, 2011 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-21652 [misc,4002aty] (1039.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 23214919. Fee Amount 1039.00 (U.S. Treasury) | |
3 | 3
![]() |