Alabama Southern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00141
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Dec 06, 2020 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Alexander P. Fleming (1)
Represented By
Kenyen Ray Brown
Maynard Cooper & Gale PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Vicki M. Davis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 19 2021
JUDGMENT as to Alexander P. Fleming, Count 1 of the Information, Imprisonment 33 months; SRT 3 years; special conditions: (1) mental health evaluation/ treatment, (2) model search condition, (3) credit restrictions, (4) financial information to Probation. Substance abuse testing requirement waived. Restitution $715,528.00; SA $100.00. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/19/2021. (mab)

Docket last updated: 12/06/2020 1:45 AM CST
Friday, November 06, 2020
1 1 INFORMATION as to Alexander P. Fleming (1) count(s) 1. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS). Arraignment and Change of Plea Hearing SET for 11/19/2020 at 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (clr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Penalty Page,
Att: 2 Waiver of Indictment
2 2 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Alexander P. Fleming with factual resume (clr) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/9/2020) (mab).
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT-ONLY ORDER as to Alexander P. Fleming: Arraignment and Guilty Plea in this matter are RESCHEDULED for 11/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. The Defendant is ORDERED to be present for said hearings. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/6/2020. (mab)
Related: [-]