South Carolina District Court
Case #: 2:20-cr-00687
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Dec 06, 2020 2:25 AM EST
Defendant
Zachary Scott Fasola (1)
Represented By
Cody James Groeber
Federal Public Defender'S Office (chas)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Dean H Secor
Us Attorneys Office (chas)
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/10/2021 1:40 AM EDT
Thursday, November 05, 2020
2 2 INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Zachary Scott Fasola (1) count(s) 1-2. (egra, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GJ Ballot
5 5 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to Zachary Scott Fasola. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 11/06/2020. (egra, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Zachary Scott Fasola for from time to time until this matter is concluded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 11/05/2020. (egra, )
Related: [-]