Member Case
Lead case is: 2:11-bk-21650

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:11-bk-21653
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2011
Converted:Jul 12, 2011
Terminated:Dec 20, 2016

Debtor
Scomex, Inc.
1802 Scovill Dr
Clarkesville, GA 30523-6348
Represented By
Heather B. Asher
Alston & Bird
contact info
John C. Weitnauer
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
BMC Group
444 N. Nash St.
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard B Russell Bldg 75 Spring Street SW
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
James H. Morawetz
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/04/2013 2:25 AM EST
Tuesday, April 19, 2011
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fee $ 1039, Filed by John C. Weitnauer on behalf of Scomex, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/17/2011. Disclosure Statement due by 8/17/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/3/2011. Schedule A due 5/3/2011. Schedule B due 5/3/2011. Schedule D due 5/3/2011. Schedule E due 5/3/2011. Schedule F due 5/3/2011. Schedule G due 5/3/2011. Schedule H due 5/3/2011. Summary of Schedules due 5/3/2011.Statistical Summary due 5/3/2011. Atty Disclosure State. due 5/3/2011. Debtor Payment Advices Due:5/3/2011, Incomplete Filings due by 5/3/2011. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2011. (Weitnauer, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-21653 [misc,4002aty] (1039.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 23214955. Fee Amount 1039.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases/i> filed by Heather N. Byrd on behalf of Scomex, Inc.. (Byrd, Heather)Text Modified on 4/20/2011 (tan)
Related: [-]