Member Case
Lead case is: 2:11-bk-21650

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:11-bk-21655
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2011
Converted:Jul 12, 2011
Terminated:Dec 20, 2016

Debtor
PCI Group, Inc.
1802 Scovill Dr
Clarkesville, GA 30523-6348
Represented By
Heather B. Asher
Alston & Bird
contact info
John C. Weitnauer
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
BMC Group
444 N. Nash St.
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
362 Richard Russell Bldg. 75 Spring St., SW
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
James H. Morawetz
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/04/2013 2:25 AM EST
Tuesday, April 19, 2011
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fee $ 1039, Filed by John C. Weitnauer on behalf of PCI Group, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/17/2011. Disclosure Statement due by 8/17/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/3/2011. Schedule A due 5/3/2011. Schedule B due 5/3/2011. Schedule D due 5/3/2011. Schedule E due 5/3/2011. Schedule F due 5/3/2011. Schedule G due 5/3/2011. Schedule H due 5/3/2011. Summary of Schedules due 5/3/2011.Statistical Summary due 5/3/2011. Atty Disclosure State. due 5/3/2011. Debtor Payment Advices Due:5/3/2011, Incomplete Filings due by 5/3/2011. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2011. (Weitnauer, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-21655 [misc,4002aty] (1039.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 23215003. Fee Amount 1039.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 "Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases" with Proposed Order filed by Heather N. Byrd on behalf of PCI Group, Inc.. (Byrd, Heather) Modified text on 4/20/2011 (lhd)
Related: [-]