Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools et al v. Gordon
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01174 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 05, 2021 4:46 AM EDT |
defendant
Robert Gordon
|
Represented By
|
interested party
United States of America
US Department of Justice Civil Rights Division 950 Pennsylvania Ave NW Room 5531
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
intervenor-plaintiff
Zion Christian Schools
Ian A. Northon, Esq. Rhoades McKee PC 55 Campau Ave, NW Ste 300
Grand Rapids, MI 49503 |
Represented By
|
plaintiff
James Norman
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Deborah Ross
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Robert Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michelle Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
William Ross
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Richard Poljan
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Christopher Abood
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Dawn Norman
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lansing Catholic High School
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Theresa Gruber
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Father Gabriel Richard High School
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Everest Collegiate High School and Academy
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jennifer Engle
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Donald Engle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Wed 03/31 11:32 AM
ORDER dismissing as moot18 motion to intervene; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Tue 03/30 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Christopher Abood, Donald Engle, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Dawn Norman, James Norman, Richard Poljan, William Ross, Deborah Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Robert Schwartz (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Proposed Order
Tue 03/30 11:25 AM
ORDER denying STIPULATION31 to further extend deadline to respond to complaint; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Proposed Order
Tue 03/30 8:14 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by defendant Robert Gordon (Giovanatti, Neil) Modified text on 3/30/2021 (pjw) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 02/26 9:44 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant to respond to complaint extended to 3/31/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Proposed Order
Fri 02/26 9:06 AM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by defendant Robert Gordon (Giovanatti, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 02/03 2:30 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant to respond to complaint extended to 3/1/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Wed 02/03 11:36 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendant Robert Gordon (Giovanatti, Neil) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition
Fri 01/08 10:56 AM
RESPONSE in opposition to FIRST MOTION to intervene intervenor-plaintiff Zion Christian Schools18 filed by Robert Gordon (Giovanatti, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Index Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 12/28 12:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline to file response to motion to intervene extended to 1/9/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Proposed Order
Tue 12/22 9:08 AM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Deadline to Respond to Zion Christian School's Motion to Intervene as Proposed Plaintiff by defendant Robert Gordon (Giovanatti, Neil) |
|
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Mon 12/21 11:32 AM
ORDER dismissing as moot6 motion for preliminary injunction; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Supplement
Fri 12/18 9:39 AM
SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for temporary restraining order 6 by plaintiffs Christopher Abood, Donald Engle, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Dawn Norman, James Norman, Richard Poljan, William Ross, Deborah Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Robert Schwartz (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Danville Order | ||
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 12/14 3:01 PM
MINUTES of motion hearing re6 MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Donald Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Jennifer Engle, Theresa Gruber, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Dawn Norman, Christopher Abood, Robert Schwartz, Deborah Ross, Michelle Schwartz, James Norman, William Ross, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Lansing Catholic High School, Richard Poljan held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
Sunday, December 13, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count
Sun 12/13 6:03 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to intervene intervenor-plaintiff Zion Christian Schools18 and , CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for FIRST MOTION to intervene intervenor-plaintiff Zion Christian Schools18 memorandum/brief in support filed by Zion Christian Schools (Northon, Ian) |
|
Saturday, December 12, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Sat 12/12 4:32 PM
REPLY to response to motion6 for preliminary injunction and for temporary restraining order filed by Christopher Abood, Donald Engle, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Dawn Norman, James Norman, Richard Poljan, William Ross, Deborah Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Robert Schwartz, United States of America, Zion Christian Schools (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dr. Markowitz | ||
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Intervene
Fri 12/11 5:28 PM
FIRST MOTION to intervene intervenor-plaintiff Zion Christian Schools by intervenor-plaintiff Zion Christian Schools; (Northon, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Memo ISO Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Document Ex A Proposed Verified Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Baker Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Hoekstra Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 Tjapkas Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 Maartense Declaration | ||
17 | 17
16
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of a Motion
Fri 12/11 3:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO6 Statement of Interest filed by United States of America (Treene, Eric) Modified text on 12/11/2020 (jem) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice Rescheduling Motion Hearing
Fri 12/11 2:22 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding MOTION for temporary restraining order, MOTION for preliminary injunction6 : motion hearing set for 12/14/2020 at 01:00 PM will be held by video before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Notify Attorney Notice
Fri 12/11 9:50 AM
NOTICE to attorney Neil Giovanatti regarding recent filing14 (jem) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 12/11 12:31 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel John Ping on behalf of defendant Robert Gordon (Ping, Daniel) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 12/11 12:34 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kyla Lillian Barranco on behalf of defendant Robert Gordon (Barranco, Kyla) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 12/11 3:03 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eric Treene on behalf of interested party United States of America ; party United States of America added (Treene, Eric) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response in Opposition
Thu 12/10 4:53 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for temporary restraining order 6 filed by Robert Gordon (Giovanatti, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Index Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit V, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit W, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit X, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Y | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 12/10 4:38 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gordon James Kangas on behalf of plaintiffs Christopher Abood, Donald Engle, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Dawn Norman, James Norman, Richard Poljan, William Ross, Deborah Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Robert Schwartz (Kangas, Gordon) |
||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 12/09 3:02 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Richard Poljan, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Robert Schwartz, Donald Engle, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Deborah Ross, James Norman, William Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Dawn Norman, Christopher Abood as to Robert Gordon waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021 (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/09 10:25 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Robert Gordon (pjw) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Wed 12/09 10:01 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Tue 12/08 3:31 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/08 2:51 PM
ORDER; Defendants shall respond to the motion by 12/10/2020 at 5:00 pm; Hearing set for 12/14/2020 at 1:00 pm in Kalamazoo; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
utility
Memorandum Re Possibly Related Case Returned to Clerk
Tue 12/08 2:25 PM
Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-325, 1:20-cv-331, 1:20-cv-335 and 1:20-cv-1104 (tlbu) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 12/08 1:59 PM
NOTICE Plaintiffs' Certification of Efforts to Give Notice to Defendant Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B) by plaintiffs Christopher Abood, Donald Engle, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Dawn Norman, James Norman, Richard Poljan, William Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Robert Schwartz (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
utility
Notice from Chambers
Tue 12/08 4:58 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE from chambers: Public courtroom access for the 12/14/2020 1:00 PM hearing will be available but may be limited. Public audio access (listen only) for the hearing is also available by phone at (877) 402-9757 with Access Code 1910797#. RECORDING OR BROADCASTING OF THIS PROCEEDING IS PROHIBITED LGenR 4.1(c)(i) and (ii) (acr) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 12/08 5:14 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Neil Anthony Giovanatti on behalf of defendant Robert Gordon (Giovanatti, Neil) |
||
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 12/08 12:05 AM
MOTION for preliminary injunction , MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiffs Christopher Abood, Donald Engle, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Dawn Norman, James Norman, Richard Poljan, William Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Robert Schwartz; (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - MI Safe Schools Roadmap, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Harvest Rock Church Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Detroit Free Press Article, Nov. 13, 2020, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Detroit Free Press Article, No. 20, 2020, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Detroit Free Press Article, Nov. 27, 2020, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Detroit News Article, Nov. 19, 2020, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Kentucky Executive Order 2020-969 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/07 9:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lansing Catholic High School (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/07 9:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Father Gabriel Richard High School (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/07 8:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Everest Collegiate High School and Academy (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/07 8:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/07 7:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Robert Gordon filed by Donald Engle, Richard Poljan, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Jennifer Engle, James Norman, William Ross, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Michelle Schwartz, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Robert Schwartz, Dawn Norman, Christopher Abood (Rheaume, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Parent Affidavits, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Everest Affidavits, | ||
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit C - Lansing Catholic Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Gabriel Richard Affidavit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - EO-2020-04, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - EO-2020-05, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - EO-2020-35, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - EO-2020-142, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I - November Order, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J - December Order, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K - CDC Document, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L - APA Document | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Mon 12/07 9:15 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiffs Christopher Abood, Donald Engle, Jennifer Engle, Everest Collegiate High School and Academy, Father Gabriel Richard High School, Theresa Gruber, Lansing Catholic High School, Michigan Association of Non-Public Schools, Dawn Norman, James Norman, Richard Poljan, William Ross, Michelle Schwartz, Robert Schwartz in the amount of $402, receipt number BMIWDC-6028654 (Rheaume, Thomas) |