New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nicholas G Garaufis
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:20-cv-05978
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2020
Terminated:Aug 08, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jun 06, 2021 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Inspire Summits LLC
Represented By
Adam E. Engel
The Engel Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Skroupa
Represented By
Adam E. Engel
The Engel Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tawid Ali
Represented By
Jeffrey Robert Maguire
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joy Barone
Represented By
Jeffrey Robert Maguire
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Carney
Represented By
Jeffrey Robert Maguire
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Johanning
Represented By
Jeffrey Robert Maguire
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jarrett Reich
Represented By
Jeffrey Robert Maguire
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 04 2022
MEMORANDUM & ORDER. Defendants' 25 motion to dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice as to all claims. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/4/2022. (fwd'd for jgm) (Lee, Tiffeny)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 08, 2022
28 28 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 08/08 1:09 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that Defendants'25 motion to dismiss is granted without prejudice as to all claims. Signed Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 8/8/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
27 27 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/05 8:03 AM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER. Defendants'25 motion to dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice as to all claims. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/4/2022. (fwd'd for jgm) (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
26 26 misc Letter Thu 01/20 7:49 AM
Letter re: submission of fully briefed motion to dismiss and oral argument by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/20 7:33 AM
Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Defendants' Opening Brief,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief,
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support Defendants' Reply Brief
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
order Order(Other) Tue 12/28 11:54 AM
ORDER: The court is in receipt of Defendants'23 letter. Defendants may file the parties' fully-briefed motion in accordance with the court's Individual Rules by, or before, January 10, 2022. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/28/2021. (Kelly, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order(Other) Tue 10/05 9:00 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of23 , the status conference previously scheduled for 11/16/2021 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak has been adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/5/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/04 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Russell Stevenson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Stevenson, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 09/23 2:26 PM
Letter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Proposed Briefing Schedule) by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 09/15 11:06 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 9/14/2021. Appearance for plaintiffs: Jeffrey Robert Maguire and John Russell Stevenson. Appearance for defendant: Adam E. Engel. Parties to exchange initial disclosures in 30 days. Document requests and interrogatories two weeks thereafter; responses 30 days after that. Status Conference set for 11/16/2021 @ 2:15 PM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM . Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5978 (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
order Scheduling Order Thu 08/19 11:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 9/14/2021 @ 11:15 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5978 So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/19/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
22 22 motion Compel Wed 08/18 10:20 AM
Letter MOTION to Compel Defendants' Response to Court's Order and Request an Initial Conference by Tawid Ali, Joy Barone, Christine Carney, Jason Johanning, Jarrett Reich. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/19 3:46 PM
ORDER: Defendants'20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is TERMINATED as improperly filed. At the April 15, 2021 pre-motion conference, the court directed the parties to agree upon a briefing schedule and submit it to the court for approval, in the event that they were unable to reach a settlement following a conference with Chief Judge Pollak. Should Defendants wish to make their motion, they may confer with Plaintiffs, agree upon a briefing schedule, and submit it to the court for approval. The parties should comply with the court's Individual Rule IV.B., which provides that no motion papers are to be filed with the court until the motion is fully briefed. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/19/2021. (Freund, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
21 21 9 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 06/14 4:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/14 4:56 PM
Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/26 9:06 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Settlement Conference proceeding held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 5/25/2021. Appearance for plaintiff: Jeffrey Robert Maguire. Appearance for defendant: Adam E. Engel. Settlement conference held. Settlement proves unsuccessful. Defendant to file motion by 6/11/2021 - response due 7/12/2021 - reply due 7/23/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order Fri 05/07 12:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The settlement conference previously scheduled for 5/11/2021 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak has been rescheduled to 5/25/2021 @ 11:45 AM. The conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM . Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5978 So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/7/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
18 18 misc Letter 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with primary event selection Tue 05/04 7:05 PM
Letter Ex Parte Settlement Conference Statement by Tawid Ali, Joy Barone, Christine Carney, Jason Johanning, Jarrett Reich (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
order Order on Motion for Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 04/21 1:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Settlement Conference is set for 5/11/2021 @ 11:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. The conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5978 The parties are to file EX PARTE settlement papers by 5/4/2021. (NOTE: the initial conference previously scheduled for 4/22/2021 is adjourned) So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/21/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
17 17 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/20 12:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION for Hearing (Settlement Conference ordered by Judge Garaufis) opposing conversion of initial conference to settlement conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Hearing Tue 04/20 8:18 AM
MOTION for Hearing (Settlement Conference ordered by Judge Garaufis) by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
minutes Pre Motion Conference Tue 04/20 2:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: On April 15, 2021, the court held a pre-motion conference via videoconference. Counsel for all parties present via video. The parties are DIRECTED to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Pollak to arrange a settlement conference. If the parties are unable to reach a settlement, the parties are DIRECTED to confer and agree upon a motion briefing schedule, which the Defendants are DIRECTED to submit to the court for approval. (Court Reporter Linda Danelczyk.) (Freund, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
15 15 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 04/07 11:42 AM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference to on/about April 22 by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 04/07 2:00 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference has been adjourned to 4/22/2021 @ 9:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. The Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 9:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5978 So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/7/2021. (Moon, Chloe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
14 14 misc Letter Thu 03/18 9:15 PM
Letter in Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Conference Request for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Return of Company Property pursuant to Individual Rule IV(a)(2) by Tawid Ali (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Tue 03/09 12:16 PM
ORDER: Defendants'13 request for a pre-motion conference is GRANTED. At the forthcoming pre-motion conference regarding Defendants' proposed Motion to Dismiss, the parties may make any additional applications, including an application to proceed with a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on a counterclaim. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/9/2021. (Freund, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
13 13 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 03/04 7:12 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Return of Company Property (pre-motion letter) by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
12 12 misc Letter Mon 03/01 4:54 PM
Letter in Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Conference Request pursuant to Individual Rule IV(a)(2) by Tawid Ali, Joy Barone, Christine Carney, Jason Johanning, Jarrett Reich (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/01 3:44 PM
ORDER: Defendant's11 application for a pre-motion conference is GRANTED. Defendant's obligation to respond to the Complaint is stayed until 14 days after the date of the conference or, if motion practice continues, 14 days following decision on the motion. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and to contact the court's Deputy at Joseph_Reccoppa@nyed.uscourts.gov to schedule the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/1/2021. (Freund, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/26 3:50 PM
Letter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (pre-motion letter) by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/01 4:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/8/2021 @ 11:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-5978 So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/1/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Mon 02/01 3:43 PM
Letter Updating Court on Defendants' January 29 Letter Motion by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/01 4:07 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - 2/26/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/1/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/29 6:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 Summons Returned Executed,1 Complaint,5 Summons Returned Executed by Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/29 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Engel on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Engel, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
order Status Report Order Thu 01/28 12:40 PM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 3/1/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/28/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/11 12:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrett Reich, Joy Barone, Jason Johanning, Christine Carney, Tawid Ali. Christopher Skroupa served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/21 1:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrett Reich, Joy Barone, Jason Johanning, Christine Carney, Tawid Ali. Inspire Summits LLC served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/09 4:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 12/09 4:14 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 12/09 4:13 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/09 4:13 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/08 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Inspire Summits LLC, Christopher Skroupa filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13802968 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jarrett Reich, Joy Barone, Jason Johanning, Christine Carney, Tawid Ali. (Maguire, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons Proposed Summons