Arizona District Court
Judge:Douglas L Rayes
Case #: 2:20-cv-02381
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 07, 2021 1:45 AM MST
Defendant
McKesson Speciality Arizona
Represented By
Justin Blaine Caresia
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Leah S Freed
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Plaintiff
Gary N Wray
6929 E 2nd Street #12
Scottsdale, AZ 85251

GPO Mar 04 2022
ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 30) is GRANTED as described in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to substitute RxC as the proper Defendant. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/3/2022. (WLP)
GPO Mar 30 2023
ORDER granting 62 RxC's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/29/2023. (WLP)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 01, 2023
76 76 misc Costs Taxed Mon 05/01 10:26 AM
Taxation Judgment in amount of $1,456.70 against Plaintiff. (ALJ)
Related: [-]