New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 2:20-cv-05965
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2020
Terminated:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 06, 2021 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Old Dominion Tobacco Company, Incorporated
5400 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Virginia Beach, VA 23462
Represented By
Avi David Schick
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Mary Grace White Metcalfe
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Hope Lu
New York City Law Department
contact info
Eric Proshansky
Corporation Counsel Of The City Of Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
96 96 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/20 9:10 PM
ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) in light of the parties' settlement agreement and joint proposed consent order, which the Court has so ordered. (ECF Nos. 93, 94.) The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the Consent Order (ECF No. 94) until December 31, 2026 pursuant to Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am. , 511 U.S. 375, 381-82 (1994). Case Closed. Ordered by Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury on 6/20/2024. (NB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
95 95 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Tue 06/18 11:56 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order [Proposed] Order of Dismissal and Retention of Jurisdiction by The City of New York (Iqbal, Aatif)
Related: [-]