Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Gregg W Zive
Case #: 3:14-bk-51015
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2014
Terminated:Nov 29, 2018

Debtor
QUEENSTAKE RESOURCES LTD.

,
Represented By
MICAELA RUSTIA MOORE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
SCOTT D. FLEMING
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
BRANDON P. JOHANSSON
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
JAMES PATRICK SHEA
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
CHARLES D. AXELROD
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Debtor
VERIS GOLD USA, INC.

,
Represented By
MICAELA RUSTIA MOORE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
SCOTT D. FLEMING
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
BRANDON P. JOHANSSON
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
JAMES PATRICK SHEA
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
CHARLES D. AXELROD
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Debtor
KETZA RIVER HOLDINGS, LTD.

,
Represented By
MICAELA RUSTIA MOORE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
SCOTT D. FLEMING
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
BRANDON P. JOHANSSON
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
JAMES PATRICK SHEA
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
CHARLES D. AXELROD
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
VERIS GOLD CORPORATION
Represented By
BRETT A. AXELROD
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
MICAELA RUSTIA MOORE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
SCOTT D. FLEMING
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
ANDREW M. SIMON
Squire Patton Boggs
contact info
NAVA HAZAN
Squire Patton Boggs
contact info
STEPHEN D. LERNER
Squire Patton Boggs
contact info
BRANDON P. JOHANSSON
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
JAMES PATRICK SHEA
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
CHARLES D. AXELROD
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
ELLIOT M. SMITH
Squire Patton Boggs
contact info


1. Veris Gold files for bankruptcy protection (elkodaily.com)
Submitted Wed 06/11/2014
2. Veris Gold Files Nevada Bankruptcy to Shield U.S. Assets (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Tue 06/10/2014
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Thursday, November 29, 2018
402 402 court Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11 and Split/Transfer/Dismissed only) Thu 11/29 1:08 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (lms)
Related: [-]