Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Petrese B Tucker
Case #: 2:20-cv-06218
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2020
Terminated:Nov 01, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 08, 2021 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY
Represented By
JASON A. CABRERA
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
JEFFREY I. PASEK
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE R BROWN
Represented By
EDWARD C. SWEENEY
Wusinich & Sweeney, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 03, 2021
16 16 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/03 1:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (jointly signed) by SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY. (CABRERA, JASON)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Mon 11/01 1:06 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 11/1/21. 11/1/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
14 14 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 10/27 4:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Settlement Conference held on 10/27/21. (amas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 10/25 3:44 PM
ORDER THAT REQUEST IS GRANTED. EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2022., MOTION FOR FULL OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/29/2022.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 10/25/21. 10/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
12 12 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 10/19 2:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Settlement Conference held on 10/19/21. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
11 11 2 pgs misc Letter Tue 10/12 5:03 PM
Letter dated 10/12/2021 with Consent Request for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines and Proposed Order by SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY. (CABRERA, JASON)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/28 9:26 AM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES REQUEST IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINES FROM THIS COURT'S 5/17 ORDER ARE EXTENDED. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 10/25/21. EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 12/23/21. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 1/21/22. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL LIST ON 4/25/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/27/21. 9/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/17 12:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. COUNSEL MAY AMEND THE PLEADINGS ON OR BEFORE 6/10/21. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/8/21. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 11/8/21. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 12/7/21. THIS CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL LIST ON 3/7/22. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 5/17/21. 5/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
8 8 9 pgs misc Report Of Fri 05/07 2:00 PM
Report Of Parties - Rule 16 by MICHELLE R BROWN. (SWEENEY, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/19 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Rule 16 Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/11/2021 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER.(adr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/18 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. CABRERA on behalf of SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY with Certificate of Service(CABRERA, JASON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
5 5 2 pgs discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 03/16 9:36 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY.(PASEK, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/16 9:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY.(PASEK, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 18, 2021
3 3 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/18 10:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHELLE R BROWN. SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY waiver sent on 1/15/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (SWEENEY, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
2 2 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/17 1:08 PM
ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY R. RICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/17/20. 12/17/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 12/10 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT against SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14771873.), filed by MICHELLE R BROWN.(SWEENEY, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 12/10 2:57 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MICHELLE R BROWN. (JL )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 12/10 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to SANDMEYER STEEL COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/10/2020 (bw, )
Related: [-]