Colorado District Court
Judge:Raymond P Moore
Referred: N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:20-cv-03616
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2020
Terminated:Aug 15, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 07, 2021 3:41 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By
Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff Pc-Denver
contact info
Kevin Scott Hoskins
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Tamara C. Jordan
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Amy M. Samberg
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Las Vegas
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mark Jay Krum
Defendant
Chubb Limited
Defendant
Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By
Kevin Scott Hoskins
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Tamara C. Jordan
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Dale Krupowicz
Represented By
John M. Palmeri
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp-Denver
contact info
Paul W. Jordan, Jr.
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Steven W. Mortensen
Represented By
Kevin Scott Hoskins
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Tamara C. Jordan
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Celia Santana
Represented By
John M. Palmeri
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp-Denver
contact info
Paul W. Jordan, Jr.
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Witcher
Represented By
Kevin Scott Hoskins
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Tamara C. Jordan
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Chubb Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin Scott Hoskins
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Tamara C. Jordan
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Amy M. Samberg
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Las Vegas
contact info
Defendant
Chubb INA Holdings, Inc
Represented By
Kevin Scott Hoskins
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Tamara C. Jordan
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Amy M. Samberg
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Las Vegas
contact info
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
Represented By
Kevin Scott Hoskins
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Tamara C. Jordan
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Denver
contact info
Amy M. Samberg
Clyde & Co. Us Llp-Las Vegas
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Jay Krum
[Pro Se E-filer, Effective 12/10/2020] 500 E 83rd St Suite 8K
New York, NY 10028

GPO Dec 11 2020
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before December 31, 2020, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on December 11, 2020. (rvill, )
GPO Apr 21 2021
ORDER Granting 56 Motion for Appointment. Mr. Daniel Stern, President and CEO of Aurum Home Technology in Denver, Colorado is appointed the third appraiser under the Policy's appraisal provision. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on April 21, 2021. (rvill, )
GPO Jun 01 2022
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. It is therefore ORDERED that case number 20-cv-03616-RM-GPG and case number 22-cv-01028-MEH are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, and future filings in either of these actions shall contain the caption as set forth above and shall be docketed under the case number 20-cv-03616-RM-GPG. This Order shall also be filed in case number 22-cv-01028-MEH. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/01/2022.(sdunb, )
GPO Sep 29 2023
ORDER denying 300 Motion to Supplement; granting in part and denying in part 302 Motion to Amend Final Judgment. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/29/2023.(cpear)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, January 02, 2025
346 346 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/02 7:48 PM
REPLY to Response to341 MOTION for Review re339 Costs Taxed Plaintiff's Motion to Seek Review of Clerk's Decision to Deny Cost Hearing and Tax Costs (without any adjustments) in the amount of $5,885.15 Against Plaintiff and in Favor of Defendants Santa Plaintiff's Reply to Broker Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Seek Review of Clerk's Decision to Deny Cost Hearing and Tax Costs Without any Adjustments filed by Plaintiff Mark Jay Krum. (Krum, Mark)
Related: [-]