Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:20-cv-01917
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2020
Terminated:May 23, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 07, 2021 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
KPMG, LLP
Represented By
Peter O Hughes
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
GREGG DEKTOR
131 Ridgemont Drive
Cranberry Township, PA 16066
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PETER BEALE
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Represented By
Brazitte A Poole
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DEBORAH KELLER
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Represented By
Brazitte A Poole
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JONATHAN WALLS
Terminated: 02/05/2021
Represented By
Brazitte A Poole
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
45 45 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 06/15 2:17 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, by stipulation and agreement of the parties, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is to mark the case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/15/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
44 44 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 06/15 11:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
43 43 utility Corrective Entry Mon 05/23 2:57 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY re41 Order Dismissing Case. As the parties have notified the Court that they anticipate filing a stipulation of dismissal, it is hereby ordered that the case is stayed and all deadlines and conferences are adjourned. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal as soon as possible. (dmm)
Related: [-]
42 42 utility Corrective Entry Case Stayed Mon 05/23 2:55 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY re41 Order Dismissing Case. As the parties have notified the Court that they anticipate filing a stipulation of dismissal, the case is stayed and all deadlines and conferences are adjourned. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal as soon as possible. (dmm) Modified on 5/23/2022 to note document filed without signature. Corrective entry filed at ECF43 (jgb)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/23 9:52 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, by stipulation and agreement of the parties, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is to mark the case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/23/2022. (dmm) Modified on 5/23/2022 to note document sealed; information in the order is not correct. Corrective entry filed at ECF43 (jgb)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 05/23 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by PETER BEALE, DEBORAH KELLER, JONATHAN WALLS (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
39 39 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/03 8:20 AM
ORDER granting38 Motion to Reschedule Post-Discovery Status Conference. The Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference initially set for 5/4/2022 is canceled and rescheduled for 6/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. The parties shall refer to4 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/3/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
38 38 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Mon 05/02 1:32 PM
MOTION Reschedule Post-Discovery Status Conference by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, January 31, 2022
37 37 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Mon 01/31 4:07 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 01/25 4:39 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/25/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
35 35 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/25 10:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER, the Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/17/2022 is canceled and rescheduled for 5/4/2022 at 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. The parties are to refer to4 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/25/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
34 34 minutes Discovery Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/25 10:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: A Video Discovery Hearing was held on 1/25/2022. The Court has taken the matter under advisement and will issue an Order regarding26 Plaintiff's First Motion to Compel Production of Documents shortly. Additionally, the Post-Discovery Status Conference will be rescheduled until after Mediation has occurred. A Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Deborah Betzler) (dmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
33 33 misc Sealed Document Tue 01/25 10:26 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT. This document Sealed pursuant to31 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Friday, January 21, 2022
32 32 misc Redacted Document Fri 01/21 1:54 PM
REDACTION to28 Response to Motion Doc. 28-1 Exhibits 1 and 2 by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Thu 01/20 9:57 AM
ORDER granting30 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods . Decision to Unseal Document deferred . Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/20/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
30 30 motion Leave to File Documents Under Seal Wed 01/19 6:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/18 12:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER, a Discovery Hearing is set for 1/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in a Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Chambers staff will provide the link for accessing the Video Conference. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/18/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/14 3:16 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, January 07, 2022
27 27 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/07 8:31 AM
ORDER, Defendant shall Respond to26 Plaintiff's First Motion to Compel Production of Documents by 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/7/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
26 26 motion Compel Thu 01/06 11:21 AM
First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by GREGG DEKTOR. (DEKTOR, GREGG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, October 25, 2021
25 25 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/25 2:36 PM
ORDER granting23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference initially set for 11/15/2021 is canceled and rescheduled for 2/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. The parties are to reference4 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the telephone conference. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/25/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Errata Mon 10/25 10:20 AM
Errata re23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by KPMG, LLP. Reason for Correction: Correction of Signature Requirement. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc QC - Filer and signature do not match Mon 10/25 9:18 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (cww)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/22 2:11 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 07, 2021
22 22 order Protective Order Thu 10/07 8:11 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER, as stipulated and agreed upon by the parties, the herein Protective Order is so entered. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/7/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
21 21 misc Stipulated Protective Order Wed 10/06 2:05 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by KPMG, LLP. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
20 20 3 pgs order Order Tue 06/08 12:29 PM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/8/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/08 12:27 PM
ADR ORDER, the parties shall file a Stipulation of ADR details after Plaintiff's Deposition has been taken. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/8/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/08 12:19 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, Rule 26(a) Disclosures due by 6/7/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 7/7/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2021, Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 8/7/2021, Depositions of Plaintiff's Experts due by 9/14/2021, Defendant Expert Reports due by 10/7/2021, Depositions of Defendant's Experts due by 11/4/2021, Discovery due by 11/4/2021. A Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 11/15/2021 at 10:15 AM in Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/8/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Tue 06/08 12:10 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan, a Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference was held on 6/7/2021. An Initial Case Management Order, ADR Order, and Order Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence Rule 502(d) to follow. (Court Reporter: Deborah Betzler) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 05/28 4:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/26 11:25 AM
ORDER setting Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference for 6/7/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/26/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Rule 26(f) Report of Parties,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Stipulation Selecting ADR Process
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Mon 04/26 10:04 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KPMG, LLP. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/23 11:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint ECF Filing No. 8 by KPMG, LLP. (Hughes, Peter) Modified on 4/23/2021 (ma)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Fri 04/23 3:59 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re14 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 4/30/2021. (ma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/22 4:40 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Peter Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/22/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Wed 04/21 2:47 PM
MOTION for attorney Peter O. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6472395) by KPMG, LLP. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter O. Hughes in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 12, 2021
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/12 5:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREGG DEKTOR. KPMG, LLP waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (DEKTOR, GREGG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
10 10 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Mon 03/01 8:52 AM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process. Plaintiff's request for a 60 day extension to serve notice of the lawsuit is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/1/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
9 9 motion Extend Time Fri 02/26 12:52 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to 60 days from 2/25/2021 by GREGG DEKTOR. (DEKTOR, GREGG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 25, 2021
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/25 10:24 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KPMG, LLP, filed by GREGG DEKTOR. (DEKTOR, GREGG) Modified on 2/25/2021 (ma)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 02/05 9:48 AM
ORDER DISMISSING INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS. By stipulation of the parties, Defendants Peter Beale, Jonathan Walls, and Deborah Keller are dismissed from this matter with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/5/2021. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Thu 02/04 2:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Individual Defendants with Prejudice by PETER BEALE, DEBORAH KELLER, JONATHAN WALLS. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/04 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brazitte A Poole on behalf of PETER BEALE, DEBORAH KELLER, JONATHAN WALLS. (Poole, Brazitte)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
4 4 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Wed 12/16 2:06 PM
AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Order Wed 12/16 2:04 PM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/16/2020. (jgb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 12/11 5:19 PM
Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number 24668066241; fee received on 12/9/2020 (188328), register receipt processed on 12/11/2020. (ma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 12/10 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT against PETER BEALE, DEBORAH KELLER, KPMG LLP, JONATHAN WALLS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number 188328), filed by GREGG A. DEKTOR. (ma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet