New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:20-cv-10495
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 09, 2021 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Fresh Direct, LLC
Represented By
Steven M. Swirsky
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer Michelle Horowitz
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.
contact info
Patrick G. Brady
Epstein Becker & Green, P.C. (nj)
contact info
Defendant
Vertex Global Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Scott Hanan
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Maxine Jordan Nicholas (Nee Kutner)
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Franklin
Represented By
Anne Melissa Seelig
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
Rony Guldmann
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 08, 2022
44 44 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/08 11:41 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Fresh Direct, LLC, Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Henry Franklin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
43 43 order Case Management Plan Tue 04/05 3:36 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2022. All expert discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, shall be completed no later than 4/30/2023. Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by 12/15/2022. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/5/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/05 3:30 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:41 Letter filed by Henry Franklin. ENDORSEMENT: For substantially the reasons outlined by Plaintiff, the Court does not believe bifurcated discovery is appropriate in this case. See, e.g., Flores v. Stanford, No. 18 Civ. 2468 (VB) (JCM), 2021 WL 4441614, at *5-6 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 28, 2021) (denying bifurcation of class discovery from individual discovery where merits issues overlapped with class issues). Rather, Defendants shall be permitted to seek discovery into the issues they perceive to stand at the threshold of this case and present their arguments incident to any future motion practice. Accordingly, the Court will enter Plaintiff's proposed case management plan under separate cover. In addition, the parties are directed to appear for a post-fact discovery conference on December 20, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Discovery Hearing set for 12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/5/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
41 41 misc Letter Wed 03/30 4:40 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from C.K. Lee dated March 30, 2022 re: Case Management Plan. Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
40 40 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 03/09 9:52 PM
ANSWER to24 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Fresh Direct, LLC..(Swirsky, Steven)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/09 9:50 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fresh Direct Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize N.V., Other Affiliate RFD II, Inc., Other Affiliate Sprinter Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate CP Fresh Truck, LLC, Other Affiliate Ahold Delhaize Investment Holding, Inc. for Fresh Direct, LLC. Document filed by Fresh Direct, LLC..(Horowitz, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/09 12:14 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
37 37 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 03/09 12:12 PM
ANSWER to24 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
36 36 32 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 02/09 10:56 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: re:29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . filed by Fresh Direct, LLC,28 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Vertex and Fresh Direct's motions to dismiss are DENIED. Defendants are hereby ordered to file Answers to the Amended Complaint by March 9, 2022. Moreover, the parties are directed to file a proposed case management plan and joint status letter by March 30, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motions at docket entries 28 and 29. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/9/2022) (js)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/09 10:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fresh Direct, LLC answer due 3/9/2022; Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/9/2022. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/27 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re:29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint .,28 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
34 34 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 08/23 5:23 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Fresh Direct, LLC..(Swirsky, Steven)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/23 1:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:28 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
30 30 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 07/09 8:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Fresh Direct, LLC..(Swirsky, Steven)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Dismiss Fri 07/09 8:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . Document filed by Fresh Direct, LLC..(Swirsky, Steven)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss Fri 07/09 2:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Brief iso MTD,
Att: 2 Certification of Counsel iso MTD,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A iso MTD,
Att: 4 Cert of Service
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
27 27 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 06/15 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/13/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Transcript Tue 06/15 3:23 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/13/2021 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
25 25 misc Letter Mon 06/07 2:30 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Hanan, Esq. dated June 7, 2021 re: Telephone Conference Transcript. Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transcript
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/01 12:20 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Fresh Direct, LLC, Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Henry Franklin. Related document:1 Complaint..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Thursday, May 13, 2021
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/13 6:49 PM
ORDER: As ordered on the record on May 13, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or by June 4, 2021. The Court adopts the following briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss: Defendants' moving papers shall be due on or July 9, 2021; Plaintiff's consolidated opposition shall be due on or by August 9, 2021; and Defendants' reply papers, if any, shall be due on or by August 23, 2021. Plaintiff's consolidated opposition may not exceed 35 pages in length. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2021., Motions due by 7/9/2021., Responses due by 8/9/2021, Replies due by 8/23/2021.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/13/2021) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Thu 05/20 12:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Pre-Motion Conference held on 5/13/2021. Attorneys Rony Guldmann and C.K. Lee representing Plaintiff present. Attorney Michael Scott Hanan representing Defendant Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. present. Attorney Jennifer Michelle Horowitz representing Defendant Fresh Direct, LLC present. (See Order dated 5/13/2021.) (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (tn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/05 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maxine Jordan Nicholas (Nee Kutner) on behalf of Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(Nicholas (Nee Kutner), Maxine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/04 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rony Guldmann on behalf of Henry Franklin..(Guldmann, Rony)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Mon 05/03 3:47 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on20 granting16 Letter Motion for Conference re:16 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Hanan dated 04/30/2021.,17 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Steven M. Swirsky dated April 30, 2021. ; granting17 Letter Motion for Conference re:16 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Hanan dated 04/30/2021.,17 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Steven M. Swirsky dated April 30, 2021. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letters seeking a pre-motionconference to request leave to file anticipated motions to dismiss(Dkt. #16, 17), and Plaintiff's letter in opposition (Dkt. #19).The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a conference on May 13,2021, at 2:00 p.m., to discuss the issues raised in the parties'letters. The conference shall take place by telephone. At theappointed time, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enteraccess code 5123533. Please note, the conference will not beavailable before 2:00 p.m. Telephone Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/3/2021) (rro)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/03 2:20 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from C.K. Lee dated May 3, 2021 re:16 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Hanan dated 04/30/2021.,17 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Steven M. Swirsky dated April 30, 2021. . Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 30, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick G. Brady on behalf of Fresh Direct, LLC..(Brady, Patrick)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Conference Fri 04/30 3:06 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Steven M. Swirsky dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by Fresh Direct, LLC..(Swirsky, Steven)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Conference Fri 04/30 10:35 AM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Hanan dated 04/30/2021. Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/07 12:17 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Hanan dated 04/07/2021.,1 Complaint. Application GRATNED, with the understanding that no further extensions of the deadline to respond to the Complaint will be granted. Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/7/2021) (nb)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/07 10:24 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael S. Hanan dated 04/07/2021. Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc.. Return Date set for 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM..(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/31 4:48 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jennifer M. Horowitz dated March 31, 2021.,1 Complaint. Application GRATNED, with the understanding that no further extensions of the deadline to respond to the Complaint will be granted. Fresh Direct, LLC answer due 4/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/31/2021) (nb)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/31 2:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jennifer M. Horowitz dated March 31, 2021. Document filed by Fresh Direct, LLC..(Horowitz, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/12 3:12 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Michael S. Hanan, Esq. dated 03/12/2021.,1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. To the Court's knowledge, this case has not been referred to Judge Gorenstein for any purpose. However, the Court will entertain a request for a referral to Judge Gorenstein for all purposes or for a settlement conference if the parties consent. Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/9/2021.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/12/2021) (nb)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/12 10:41 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Michael S. Hanan, Esq. dated 03/12/2021. Document filed by Vertex Global Solutions, Inc.. Return Date set for 4/9/2021 at 09:00 AM..(Hanan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/19 12:44 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Fresh Direct, LLC served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/19 12:43 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Vertex Global Solutions, Inc. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/31 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Henry Franklin..(Seelig, Anne)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 12/14 12:26 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fresh Direct, LLC..(dnh)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 12/14 12:22 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vertex Global Solutions, Inc...(dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 12/14 12:09 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/14 12:13 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/14 12:13 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/14 12:14 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 12/11 2:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fresh Direct, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 12/11 2:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vertex Global Solutions, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/11 2:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/11 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Fresh Direct, LLC, Vertex Global Solutions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22996570)Document filed by Henry Franklin..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C