Muhmoud v. City Of San Jose et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:20-cv-08808 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 09, 2021 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kevin Balak
|
|
Defendant
Blage Zelalich
|
|
Defendant
Dean Whipple
|
|
Defendant
Swenson Development Management, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Barry Swenson
|
|
Defendant
Shannon Smyth-Mendoza
|
|
Defendant
Santa Clara Valley Transit Authority
|
|
Defendant
Todd Rothbard
|
|
Defendant
Leo Prescott
|
|
Defendant
Paul Messier
|
|
Defendant
Market Street Partners, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Market Street Partners SJ, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Christian Hagen
|
|
Defendant
Rick Galea
|
|
Defendant
Richard Doyle
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Creech
|
|
Defendant
City Of San Jose
|
|
Defendant
Forrest Cerrato
|
|
Plaintiff
Mustafa Muhmoud
1809 S Street Suite 101-234
Sacramento, CA 95811 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
133 | 133
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A Scott (Scott, Catherine) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
132 | 132
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 04/12 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santa Clara Valley Transit Authority re131 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss: Memorandum of Points and Authority ,129 Declaration in Support,130 Proposed MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss SCVTA's Certificate of Service (North, Richard) |
|
131 | 131
motion
Protective Order
Fri 04/12 3:46 PM
MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss: Memorandum of Points and Authority filed by Santa Clara Valley Transit Authority. Responses due by 4/26/2024. Replies due by 5/3/2024. (North, Richard) |
|
130 | 130
motion
Protective Order
Fri 04/12 3:25 PM
Proposed MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Santa Clara Valley Transit Authority. Responses due by 4/26/2024. Replies due by 5/3/2024. (North, Richard) |
|
129 | 129
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 04/12 3:18 PM
Declaration of Richard North in support of Defendant SCVTA's Motion for A Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed bySanta Clara Valley Transit Authority.(North, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration Exhibits A-F |