District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Case #: 1:20-cv-03590
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2020
Case in other court:N. D. Cal., 21-CV-02108 N.D. Cal., 3:20-cv-08817 N.D. Cal., 3:21-cv-618 N.D. Cal., 3:21cv00336 N.D. Cal., 3:21cv00337 N.D. Cal., 4:20-cv-9217 N.D. Cal., 5:20-cv-09130 N.D. Cal., 5:21-cv-01117
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 07, 2021 1:24 AM EDT
Defendant
FACEBOOK INC.
Represented By
Mark Charles Hansen
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC
contact info
Aaron Martin Panner
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Kevin Huff
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick,
contact info
Silvija A. Strikis
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Kevin J. Miller
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Leslie V. Pope
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Geoffrey M. Klineberg
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By
Gary Mitchell London, Jr
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Mary Casale
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Mark Silvia
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Burke W. Kappler
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Owen T. Masters
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Michael H Smith
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Robert E. Zuver, Jr.
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Henry J. Hauser
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Daniel John Matheson
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Maria M. DiMoscato
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Noel Miller
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Sylvia Zhang
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Robert E. Zuver, Jr
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Krisha A. Cerilli
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Patricia Galvan
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Brian Telpner
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
David E. Owyang
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Eric Cochran
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Michael Mikawa
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Rebecca Weinstein
Federal Trade Commission
contact info

GPO Jun 28 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 72 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/28/2021. (lcjeb2)
GPO Jan 11 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 89 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/11/2022. (lcjeb1)
GPO Sep 06 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 188 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/6/2022. (lcjeb2)
GPO Apr 26 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION re. 280 Order on 266 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/26/2023. (lcjeb4)
GPO Nov 13 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION (redacted) re. 383 Order on Defendant's 324 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 327 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on November 13, 2024. (lcjeb2)
GPO Apr 02 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 504 Order on Motions to Quash. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/2/2025. (lcjeb1)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
minutes Bench Trial - Held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/08 5:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Bench Trial held on 5/8/2025. Plaintiff witnesses: Adam Mosseri and Alex Schultz Related [+]. Bench Trial to continue on 5/12/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A- In Person before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor (AM) and Janice Dickman (PM)) (znbn)
Related: [-] sumed and continued
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
minutes Bench Trial - Held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 05/07 5:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Bench Trial held on 5/7/2025. Plaintiff witnesses: Damon McCoy Related [+], Will Cathcart, Michael Malkiewicz, and Alex Schultz. Bench Trial continued to 5/8/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A- In Person before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor (AM) and Sara Wick (PM)) (znbn)
Related: [-] sumed and concluded
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
588 588 misc Sealed Document Tue 05/06 10:21 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re587 Notice (Other) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Hansen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Amended Witness List - SEALED
587 587 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/06 10:15 PM
NOTICE of Amended Witness List by META PLATFORMS, INC.(Hansen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Amended Witness List
586 586 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Pastore, Jr on behalf of JACOB ANDREOU, SARAL JAIN, DAVID A. LEVENSON, SNAP INC. (Pastore, James)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 9:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the583 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James J. Pastore, Jr. is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) .[LINK:Click for instructions] . So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/6/2025. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
minutes Bench Trial - Held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/06 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Bench Trial held on 5/6/2025. Bench Trial will resume on 5/7/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 22A- In Person before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. Plaintiff Witnesses: Guy Rosen/Damon McCoy. (Court Reporters- Tammy Nestor (AM) and Janice Dickman (PM).) (mac)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
585 585 trial Trial Brief Mon 05/05 8:54 PM
TRIAL BRIEF Objecting to the Admission of the FTC's Hearsay Expert Reports into Evidence by META PLATFORMS, INC..(Hansen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
584 584 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/05 8:51 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Statement Regarding the Admissibility of Expert Reports by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Matheson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
583 583 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 7:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James J. Pastore, Jr., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11667685. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JACOB ANDREOU, SARAL JAIN, DAVID A. LEVENSON, SNAP INC..(O'Neil, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
minutes Bench Trial - Held Mon 05/05 12:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Bench Trial held on 5/5/2025. Plaintiff witness: Peter Deng. Bench Trial continued to 5/6/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A- In Person before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (znbn) Modified to add date on 5/5/2025 (znbn)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/05 1:54 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 5/6/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A- In Person before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
581 581 misc Sealed Document Sun 05/04 11:38 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC. re580 Status Report (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Hansen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Status Report - SEALED
580 580 misc Status Report Sun 05/04 11:33 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by META PLATFORMS, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
579 579 misc Sealed Document Fri 05/02 4:14 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Hansen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Meta Platforms, Inc.'s April 30, 2025 Amended Exhibit List
Thursday, May 01, 2025
578 578 misc Sealed Document Thu 05/01 9:30 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by META PLATFORMS, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Hansen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Meta Platforms, Inc.'s April 30, 2025 Amended Exhibit List
minutes Bench Trial - Held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/01 4:00 PM
Minute Entry for Bench Trial held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/1/2025. Plaintiff's witnesses: Curtiss Cobb Related [+], John Hegeman, and Eric Morrison (video deposition). Bench Trial to continue on 5/5/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 22A (in person) before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporters: Tammy Nestor (AM) and Sara Wick (PM)) (lsj)
Related: [-] sumed from 4/30/2025