District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:14-cv-00997
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2014
Terminated:Jul 24, 2020
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 8:34 PM EST
Defendant
CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By
Marcia Kay Sowles
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
MUCKROCK, LLC
Represented By
Kelly Brian McClanahan
National Security Counselors
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 14 CIAs Motion for Summary Judgment and 22 MuckRocks Cross-Motion for summary judgment. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/28/2018. (lckbj1)

1. MuckRock / News (muckrock.com)
Submitted Wed 06/11/2014
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
82 82 misc Status Report Fri 04/18 1:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Bickford, James)
Related: [-]