Stacey Bridges and Creighton Bloyd et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:19-bk-23649
Lead BK case is: 7:19-bk-23649
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:20-ap-07027 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacey Bridges and Creighton Bloyd et al
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 10/01 7:22 PM
Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding (Proposed) Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 09/28 11:15 AM
So Ordered Stipulation and Dismissal Signed on 9/28/2021 . (Li, Dorothy) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 09/28 11:23 AM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-7027 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Li, Dorothy) |
||
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Mon 09/27 5:34 PM
Stipulation / [Proposed] Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Filed by Marc Joseph Tobak on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Tobak, Marc) |
|
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 09/20 8:02 PM
Affidavit of Service of Rohany Tejada Regarding (Proposed) Fifth Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 09/16 4:58 PM
Fifth Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 9/16/2021 Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint . (Correa, Mimi) |
|
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Wed 09/15 3:52 PM
Stipulation / [Proposed] Fifth Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Marc Joseph Tobak on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Tobak, Marc) |
|
Thursday, June 10, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 06/10 7:10 PM
Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Proposed Fourth Stipulation and Agreed Order, and Fourth Stipulation and Agreed Order filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 06/04 3:48 PM
Fourth Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 6/4/2021 Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Fri 06/04 1:27 PM
Stipulation / [Proposed] Fourth Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Marc Joseph Tobak on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Tobak, Marc) |
|
Friday, May 07, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 05/07 11:52 AM
Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding [Proposed] Third Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 05/04 3:16 PM
Third Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 5/4/2021 Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. The initial Pre-Trial Conference in this adversary proceeding presently scheduledfor July 19, 2021 at 10:00 am (prevailing Eastern Time) is adjourned to a date to be determined by the Court (CourtSolutions) (RDD) . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Documents
Tue 05/04 3:17 PM
Pending Documents Terminated. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/03 10:16 PM
Stipulation /[Proposed] Third Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Marc Joseph Tobak on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Tobak, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/06 8:43 PM
Affidavit of Service of Jeff BloisseBaez Regarding (Proposed) Second Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 04/02 9:23 AM
Second Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 4/2/2021 Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. The initial Pre-Trial Conference in this adversary proceeding presently scheduledfor June 16, 2021 at 10:00 am (prevailing Eastern Time) is adjourned to July 19, 2021 at 10:00 am (prevailing Eastern Time) at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (RDD) (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/01 9:10 PM
Stipulation / [Proposed] Second Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Marc Joseph Tobak on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Tobak, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 03/03 9:29 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 3/3/2021 Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Tue 03/02 5:14 PM
Stipulation / [Proposed] Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint Filed by Marc Joseph Tobak on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Tobak, Marc) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/02 5:10 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding /Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Marc Joseph Tobak on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Tobak, Marc) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 02/05 9:52 AM
SECOND Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (RDD). Answer due by 3/8/2021. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/04 6:14 PM
Amended Complaint against all defendants Filed by James Franklin Ozment I on behalf of Charles Daniel Fitch, Bloyd Creighton, Others Similarly Situated. (Ozment, James) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix 1 - Settlement Agreement with U.S. Department of Justice | ||
Att: 2 Appendix 2 - United States DOJ Complaint against Walmart | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Thu 02/04 6:28 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by James Franklin Ozment I on behalf of Bloyd Creighton, Charles Daniel Fitch, Others Similarly Situated. (Ozment, James) |
||
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/04 2:25 PM
Order signed on 1/4/2021 Granting Application of Roderick Graham to be admitted to Practice Pro Hac Vice . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
5 | 5
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/04 2:23 PM
Order signed on 1/4/2021 Granting Application of James Frank Ozment to be admitted to Practice Pro Hac Vice . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 12/18 10:50 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (RDD). Answer due by 1/19/2021. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Fri 12/18 10:48 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Roderick Graham on behalf of Stacey Bridges, Bloyd Creighton, Others Similarly Situated. Filing fee collected, receipt #51602. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Fri 12/18 10:45 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Frank Ozment on behalf of Stacey Bridges, Bloyd Creighton, Others Similarly Situated. Filing fee collected, receipt #51603. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 12/11 3:27 PM
Adversary case 20-07027 Complaint against Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. (Fee Amount $ 350.00.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Frank Ozment on behalf of Stacey Bridges and Creighton Bloyd et al. (Vargas, Ana) |