Chad Parker, et al v. Governor of Pennsylvania, et al
Original Case: 1:20-cv-01601
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03518 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 24, 2021 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHAD PARKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
REBECCA KENWICK-PARKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARK REDMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DONNA REDMAN
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 23 2021
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: CHAGARES, HARDIMAN and MATEY, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 10. Judge: CHAGARES Authoring. |
Docket last updated: 11/24/2021 3:30 AM EST |
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01601. (LMR) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 4 46 pgs MEMORANDUM AND ORDER | ||
2 pgs ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean A. Kirkpatrick on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pennsylvania, Attorney General of Pennsylvania, Secretary of Pennsylvania Department of Health. 20-3518 (SAK) | ||
2 pgs ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pennsylvania, Attorney General of Pennsylvania, Secretary of Pennsylvania Department of Health. 20-3518 (CMT) |