Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-11099

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maureen Tighe
Case #: 1:20-ap-01121
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2020
Terminated:Sep 28, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Arthur Martiryan
8420 Amboy Ave
Sun Valley, CA 91352
Represented By
Arthur Martiryan
contact info
Plaintiff
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
4375 Jutland Drive Suite 200 P.O. Box 17933
San Diego, CA 92117
Represented By
Jillian A Benbow
Aldridge Pite LLP
contact info
Trustee
Diane C Weil (TR)
5950 Canoga Avenue, Suite 400
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
52 52 notice Notice Wed 03/22 4:47 PM
Notice of Vacated Hearing with Declaration of Service Filed by Plaintiff JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Related [+]. (Garan, Todd)
Related: [-] 50 Hearing Set Application for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor.48 hearing to be held on 3/27/2023 at 11:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Maureen Tighe (EG)