Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:20-cv-05092
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2020
Re-opened:Nov 15, 2021
Terminated:Nov 15, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 13, 2021 7:10 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
MTC Corporation
Represented By
Sarah Richards Smith
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
John Anthony Christy
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mini Storage Depot on Antioch Pike, LLC
Represented By
Matthew McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Matthew R McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Simon Howard Bloom
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Doorhy
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Shannan Freeman Oliver
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mitchell F. Cooke
Represented By
Sarah Richards Smith
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
John Anthony Christy
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyler F. Cooke
Represented By
Sarah Richards Smith
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
John Anthony Christy
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
Defendant
MTC Corporation
Represented By
Sarah Richards Smith
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
John Anthony Christy
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
James Bryan Watford
Schreeder, Wheeler, & Flint, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Jacqueline Barnum
Interested Party
Peter Barrett
Interested Party
Ervin Bontrager
Interested Party
Karen Bontrager
Interested Party
Wendell Bontrager
Interested Party
Mark Breen
Interested Party
Joy J Herzog Calwell
Interested Party
Chandler Williams Remainder Trust
Interested Party
Jill Chinn
Interested Party
Chinn Family Limited Partnership
Interested Party
Carol Choudhary
Interested Party
Carol A. Choudhary
Interested Party
Jay-Paul Choudhary
Interested Party
Choudhary Investments LLC
Interested Party
Erik Coover
Interested Party
Jim Coover
Interested Party
Kathy Coover
Interested Party
Coover Living Trust
Interested Party
Coover Multi-Generational Trust
Interested Party
DGP 2011 Marital Trust
Interested Party
Russ DeVore
Interested Party
DeVore Investments, LLC
Interested Party
Susan K. Ellis
Interested Party
Thomas P. Ellis
Interested Party
Cheryl R. Enders
Interested Party
Gary L. Enders
Interested Party
Equity Trust Company Custodian FBO Matthew VanMeeter IRA
Interested Party
Equity Trust Company FBO Thomas Paul Ellis IRA
Interested Party
Audrey Evans
Interested Party
John A. Goebel
Interested Party
David Grant
Interested Party
Emily Grant
Interested Party
Leah Grant
Interested Party
Patty Grant
Interested Party
R. Douglas Grant
Interested Party
Sarah Grant
Interested Party
Grant Capital Partners LLC
Interested Party
Eric T. Grotness
Interested Party
Kelly Guinaugh
Interested Party
Devin Huber
Interested Party
Janice M. Huber
Interested Party
Monte J. Huber
Interested Party
JUH Ventures LLC
Interested Party
James and Catherine Klaassen Revocable Trust
Interested Party
Janice M. Huber Living Trust U/A dtd 11/01/1997
Interested Party
Jeffrey Joers
Interested Party
Randall Joers
Interested Party
Ronald Joers
Interested Party
Joers Partnership
Interested Party
John A. Goebel, Jr. Trust dated 7/2/2002
Interested Party
Joseph L. and Frances L. Simek Family Investments, LP
Interested Party
Joy J. Herzog Trust
Interested Party
Karen O. Bontrager, Trustee 01/08/98 U/A/DTD
Interested Party
Karen S. Bontrager Revocable Trust u/a/d January 31, 1998
Interested Party
Chris Katris
Interested Party
James G. Katris
Interested Party
Crystal Kauffman
Interested Party
Catherine Klaassen
Interested Party
James Klaassen
Interested Party
Tracy Klopfenstein
Interested Party
Stillman D. Knight
Interested Party
Alexander Korenstra
Interested Party
Bruce Korenstra
Interested Party
Sam Korenstra
Interested Party
Sandra Korenstra
Interested Party
Korenstra Family Corp
Interested Party
Korenstra Family Foundation, LP
Interested Party
Korenstra Foundation, LP
Interested Party
Anupam Ladha
Interested Party
Larry A. Swank Revocable Living Trust
Interested Party
Daniel L. Lepley
Interested Party
Carolyn G. Lessman
Interested Party
David L. Light
Interested Party
Ken Marx
Interested Party
Mary Ann Stutzman Revocable Trust
Interested Party
Katie Miller
Interested Party
Monte J. Huber Living Trust dated 8/1/2009
Interested Party
N. Williams Family Investments Limited Partnership
Interested Party
Robert F. Nielsen
Interested Party
NuView Trust Co. Custodian FBO Erik T. Grotness Traditional IRA Account
Interested Party
Keith Page
Interested Party
Mark A. Phillabaum
Interested Party
Paul E. Phillabaum
Interested Party
Charlene Pierce
Interested Party
Marilyn E. Pobiak
Interested Party
Jonathan Ratliff
Interested Party
Ratliff Charitable Foundation
Interested Party
Charles Rhea
Interested Party
Ida Rhea
Interested Party
Patricia Sue Rhea
Interested Party
Robert Rhea
Interested Party
Rhea Non-Exempt Trust
Interested Party
Daniel B. Rice
Interested Party
Robert F. Nielsen Separate Property Trust
Interested Party
Christine E. Sands
Interested Party
Andy Satz
Interested Party
Mark Satz
Interested Party
Harold Douglas Schrock
Interested Party
Jeannine B. Schrock
Interested Party
Joseph M. Scimia
Interested Party
Lawrence Seal
Interested Party
Sharron Seal
Interested Party
Shlarry Trust dated December 7, 2018
Interested Party
Lynn A. Sickafoose
Interested Party
Donna Simek
Interested Party
Landin Simek
Interested Party
Laruen Simek
Interested Party
Quaid Simek
Interested Party
Richard Simek
Interested Party
Seth Simek
Interested Party
Shannon Simek
Interested Party
Scott Soracoe
Interested Party
Sterling Self Storage Fund III Manager, LLC
Interested Party
Sterling Self Storage Fund III, LP
Interested Party
Stillman D. Knight, Jr. Revocable Trust
Interested Party
Mary Ann Stutzman
Interested Party
Michael Stutzman
Interested Party
Chloe J. Swank
Interested Party
Joshua Swank
Interested Party
Lance Swank
Interested Party
Larry A. Swank, II
Interested Party
Lily C. Swank
Interested Party
Sherry L.T. Swank
Interested Party
Tiffani R. Swank
Interested Party
Sheila Terlep
Interested Party
The Medlaw Partners LLC
Interested Party
The Revocable Trust Agreement of Daniel B. Rice
Interested Party
Terry L. Tucker
Interested Party
Matthew VanMeeter
Interested Party
John P:. VanMeter
Interested Party
Matthew D. VanMeter
Interested Party
Andrea L. Vinstra
Interested Party
Robert H. Voss
Interested Party
Wawasee Community School Corporation
Interested Party
David E. Weiss
Interested Party
William Stutzman, Jr. Revocable Trust
Interested Party
Adam Williams
Interested Party
Ashley Williams
Interested Party
Chandler Williams
Interested Party
Chris Williams
Interested Party
Cooper Williams
Interested Party
Cooper L. Williams
Interested Party
Erin Williams
Interested Party
Heather Williams
Interested Party
Leamon Williams
Interested Party
Nancy Williams
Interested Party
Nancy E. Williams
Interested Party
Ruben Williams
Interested Party
Saige Wooldridge
Plaintiff
Mini Storage Depot at Westfield, LLC
Represented By
Matthew McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Matthew R McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Simon Howard Bloom
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Doorhy
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Shannan Freeman Oliver
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mini Storage Depot on Antioch Pike, LLC
Represented By
Matthew McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Matthew R McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Simon Howard Bloom
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Doorhy
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Shannan Freeman Oliver
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mini Storage Depot on Brick Church, LLC
Represented By
Matthew McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Matthew R McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Simon Howard Bloom
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Doorhy
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Shannan Freeman Oliver
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mini Storage Depot on Northfield Blvd, LLC
Represented By
Matthew McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Matthew R McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Simon Howard Bloom
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Doorhy
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Shannan Freeman Oliver
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mini Storage Depot on Old Hickory, LLC
Represented By
Matthew McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Matthew R McCubbins
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Simon Howard Bloom
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Doorhy
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Shannan Freeman Oliver
Bloom Parham, LLP
contact info
unknown
Dustin Norris


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 09, 2023
62 62 discov Certificate of Service Mon 10/09 1:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Plaintiffs' First Post-Judgment Interrogatories to Defendants and Plaintiffs' First Post-Judgment Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants by Mini Storage Depot at Westfield, LLC, Mini Storage Depot on Antioch Pike, LLC, Mini Storage Depot on Brick Church, LLC, Mini Storage Depot on Northfield Blvd, LLC, Mini Storage Depot on Old Hickory, LLC.(Oliver, Shannan)
Related: [-]