California Central District Court
Case #: 2:20-cr-00579
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 16, 2020 11:38 PM PST
Defendant
Artur Ayvazyan (3)
Represented By
Nadine C Hettle
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
David D. Diamond
Diamond And Associates
contact info
Thomas A. Mesereau, Jr.
Mesereau Law Group
contact info
Jennifer J. Wirsching
Jennifer J. Wirsching
contact info
Defendant
Richard Ayvazyan (1)
Represented By
Michael A. Keough
Steptoe And Johnson LLP
contact info
Nicholas P. Silverman
Steptoe And Johnson LLP
contact info
Ashwin J. Ram
Steptoe And Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tamara Dadyan (4)
Represented By
David D. Diamond
Diamond And Associates
contact info
Fred G Minassian
Law Offices Of Fred G Minassian Inc
contact info
Defendant
Marietta Terabelian (2)
Represented By
David D. Diamond
Diamond And Associates
contact info
John Lewis Littrell
Bienert Katzman PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brent A. Whittlesey
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Julian Lucien Andre
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/17/2021 5:28 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Richard Ayvazyan, Marietta Terabelian in violation of 18:1349. Approved by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Richard Ayvazyan (1), Marietta Terabelian (2). (mhe) [2:20-mj-05081-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Richard Ayvazyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05081-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Marietta Terabelian (mhe) [2:20-mj-05081-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Artur Ayvazyan, Tamara Dadyan in violation of 18:1349. Approved by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar as to Artur Ayvazyan (1), Tamara Dadyan (2). (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Artur Ayvazyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
4 4 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Artur Ayvazyan; defendants Year of Birth: 1980; date of arrest: 11/5/2020 (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
19 19 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Tamara Dadyan; defendants Year of Birth: 1981 (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
20 20 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams as to Defendant Tamara Dadyan. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Fred G Minassian for Tamara Dadyan, Retained, present. Court orders bail set as: Tamara Dadyan (2) $200,000 Appearance Bond, see attached for terms and conditions. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/30/2020 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 12/4/2020 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. RELEASE ORDER NO 39696Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
21 21 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan, declaring that I have been issued a passport or other travel document(s), but they are not currently in my possession. I will surrender any passport or other travel document(s) issued to me, to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency by the deadline imposed. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
22 22 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
23 23 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
24 24 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Tamara Dadyan is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 11/30/20 at 11:30 am and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 12/4/20 at 11:30 am before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
25 25 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $50,000 by surety: Kare Dadyan for Filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
26 26 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $50,000 by surety: Karen Dadyan for Filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
27 27 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (No Justification) filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)26 (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
28 28 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $50,000 by surety: Arsen Dadyan for Filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
29 29 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (No Justification) filed by Defendant Tamara Dadyan re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)28 (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
30 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams as to Defendant Tamara Dadyan. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the prosecutor is ordered to comply with his or her obligation to produce exculpatory evidence under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and is reminded of the possible consequences of violating that law and this order, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of all or some charges with or without prejudice, contempt, and sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
5 5 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar as to Defendant Artur Ayvazyan. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Nadine C Hettle for Artur Ayvazyan, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders bail set as: Artur Ayvazyan (1) $100,000 Appearance Bond, see attached for terms and conditions. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/30/2020 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 12/3/2020 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. RELEASE ORDER NO 40591Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan, declaring that my passport and any other travel documents are in the possession of federal authorities. If any such document is returned to me during the pendency of this case, I will immediately surrender it to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Artur Ayvazyan is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 11/30/20 at 11:30 am and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 12/3/20 at 11:30 am before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS MANDATORY RULE 5(f) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar as to Defendant Artur Ayvazyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER FOR CONTRIBUTION TOWARD ATTORNEYS FEES by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar as to Artur Ayvazyan. Funds in the amount of for these proceedings only, shall be paid by the defendant to the Clerks Office as follows: a total sum of $250 due no later than 11/20/20. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan. (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Artur Ayvazyan. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $50,000 by surety: Lilit Maylan for Filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $50,000 by surety: Greta Akopyan for Filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
15 15 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (No Justification) filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)13 (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
16 16 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (No Justification) filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)14 (mhe) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
18 18 DECLARATION of Artur Avyazyan filed by Defendant Artur Ayvazyan Re Passport (Hettle, Nadine) [2:20-mj-05321-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
32 32 INDICTMENT Filed as to Richard Ayvazyan (1) count(s) 1, 2-7, 8-11, 12, Marietta Terabelian (2) count(s) 1, 2-7, 8-11, Artur Ayvazyan (3) count(s) 1, 2-7, 8-11, Tamara Dadyan (4) count(s) 1, 2-7, 8-11. Offense occurred in LA. (ja)
Related: [-]
33 33 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Julian L Andre as to Defendant Richard Ayvazyan; defendants Year of Birth: 1978 (ja)
Related: [-]
34 34 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Julian L Andre as to Defendant Marietta Terabelian; defendants Year of Birth: 1984 (ja)
Related: [-]
35 35 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Julian L Andre as to Defendant Artur Ayvazyan; defendants Year of Birth: 1980 (ja)
Related: [-]
36 36 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Julian L Andre as to Defendant Tamara Dadyan; defendants Year of Birth: 1981 (ja)
Related: [-]
37 37 2 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (ja)
Related: [-]
39 39 1 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (ja)
Related: [-]