California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:20-cv-02480
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2020
Terminated:Nov 12, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 13, 2021 2:59 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Rancho Cordova
Represented By
Carl L. Fessenden
Porter Scott, PC
contact info
Defendant
Brian Fowell
Represented By
Domenic D. Spinelli
Spinelli Donald & Nott
contact info
Plaintiff
E.T.
Represented By
John L. Burris
Law Offices Of John L. Burris
contact info
Benjamin Nisenbaum
Law Offices Of John L. Burris
contact info
James A. Cook
Law Offices Of John L. Burris
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Leataie Tagalu
Terminated: 01/25/2021
Represented By
John L. Burris
Law Offices Of John L. Burris
contact info

GPO Feb 10 2021
A)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2021 REFERRING this matter to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for a Settlement Conference on 3/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. All discovery obligations, including Rule 26 disclosures, are STAYED until 30 days after the completion of the Settlement Conference and Responsive pleadings shall be due 20 days after completion of the settlement conference. (Tupolo,
GPO Feb 11 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/10/2021 GRANTING 10 Petition that Leataie Tagalu is now APPOINTED guardian ad litem of Minor E.T.(Reader, L)
GPO Oct 20 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/19/2021 APPROVING Minor E.T.'s Compromise. (Huang, H)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, November 12, 2021
36 36 misc Stipulation Fri 11/12 9:52 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice by E.T.. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 11/12 2:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/12/2021: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.36 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
35 35 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/20 10:53 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/19/2021 APPROVING Minor E.T.'s Compromise. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/13 9:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/13/2021: In light of the Plaintiff's Status Report (ECF No.33 ) the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED 30 days from today's date (11/12/2021). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
33 33 misc Status Report Tue 10/05 6:05 PM
STATUS REPORT by E.T.. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
order Minute Order ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Fri 10/01 10:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/1/2021: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion for Order regarding Minor's Compromise (ECF No.31 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 10/14/2021 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/10 3:40 PM
MOTION Order re Minor's Compromise by E.T.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/10 3:04 PM
[FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCKET No.31 ] MOTION Order re Minor's Compromise by E.T.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Cook, James) Modified on 9/10/2021 (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
order Minute Order Tue 09/07 9:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/7/2021: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Petition of Approval of Minor's Compromise (ECF No.26 ). The Petition is improperly filed and shall be refiled as a properly noticed motion. (Text Only Entry) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 09/07 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/7/2021: In light of the Plaintiff's Status Report (ECF No.27 ) the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED 30 days from today's date (10/7/2021). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 09/03 2:53 PM
STATUS REPORT by E.T., Leataie Tagalu. (Burris, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Petition Fri 09/03 2:51 PM
PETITION for Approval of Minor's Compromise by E.T., Leataie Tagalu. (Burris, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 07/07 12:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/7/2021: In light of the Plaintiff's Status Report (ECF No.24 ) the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED 60 days from today's date (7/7/2021). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 06/25 4:20 PM
STATUS REPORT by E.T.. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
23 23 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/26 2:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2021: After discussions with parties, the deadline to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED 30 days from today's date (5/26/2021). (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
22 22 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/16 1:25 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference (Zoom) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 3/16/2021. Counsel for parties present. Plaintiff's counsel, Benjamin Nisenbaum present for part of the settlement conference. Plaintiff representatives, Leata (Tufono) Tagalu (Guardian Ad Litem), Mele Tufono (Grandmother), Carl Tufono (Grandfather), and Crystal Mackey (Paralegal for Burris Law Firm) present. Defendant, Brian Fowell and Randy Rendig (George Hills Company Claims Administrator for City of Rancho Cordova) also present. After discussions with the Court, parties reached a verbal settlement subject to risk pool and City Counsel approval. The Court also noted that a Minor's Compromise will also be forthcoming in the case. Terms of the settlement stated on the record by the Court and agreed to by parties. All pending dates are VACATED. Dispositional documents to be filed within 60 days. Plaintiff's Counsel John Burris, Benjamin Nisenbaum, and James Cook present. Defendants' Counsel Carle Fessenden and Domenic Spinelli present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement Thu 03/11 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT STATEMENT by E.T. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement Tue 03/09 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT STATEMENT by Brian Fowell (Spinelli, Domenic)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement Tue 03/09 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT STATEMENT by E.T. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/03 12:13 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Domenic D. Spinelli on behalf of Brian Fowell. Attorney Spinelli, Domenic D. added. (Spinelli, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/11 1:48 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/10/2021 GRANTING10 Petition that Leataie Tagalu is now APPOINTED guardian ad litem of Minor E.T Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
16 16 order Minute Order Wed 02/10 5:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/10/2021: In light of the Order setting settlement conference on 3/16/2021 before Judge Newman (ECF No.15 ), the parties are instructed to have a principal with full settlement authority present for the settlement conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms. The individual with full settlement authority to settle must also have unfettered discretion and authority to change the settlement position of the party, if appropriate. The purpose behind requiring attendance of a person with full settlement authority is that the parties view of the case may be altered during the face to face conference. An authorization to settle for a limited dollar amount or sum certain can be found not to comply with the requirement of full authority to settle. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven days prior to the settlement conference. These statements shall be simultaneously delivered to the Court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. These statements should not be filed on the case docket. If a party desires to share additional confidential information with the Court, they may do so pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 270(d) and (e). The settlement conference will take place by remote means (Zoom). Parties will receive instructions on how to appear closer to the hearing date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Waldrop, A)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/10 10:25 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2021 REFERRING this matter to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for a Settlement Conference on 3/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. All discovery obligations, including Rule 26 disclosures, are STAYED until 30 days after the completion of the Settlement Conference and Responsive pleadings shall be due 20 days after completion of the settlement conference. (Tupolo, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
14 14 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 02/09 5:15 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Early Settlement Conference and Stay of Discovery and Responsive Pleadings by City of Rancho Cordova. (Fessenden, Carl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
13 13 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/02 5:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by E.T.. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
12 12 service Certificate of Service Mon 02/01 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE9 amended complaint by E.T.. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 01/28 10:09 AM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by City of Rancho Cordova. Attorney Fessenden, Carl L. added. (Fessenden, Carl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
10 10 misc Petition Mon 01/25 3:50 PM
PETITION for Appointing Leataie Tagalu as Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiff E.T. by E.T.. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/25 3:24 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by E.T..(Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 18, 2021
8 8 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 01/18 12:20 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/12 12:40 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brian Fowell served on 1/9/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/12 12:38 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Rancho Cordova served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/18 2:14 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James A. Cook on behalf of E.T.. Attorney Cook, James A. added. (Cook, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/18 12:24 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Benjamin Nisenbaum on behalf of E.T.. Attorney Nisenbaum, Benjamin added. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for TLN Wed 12/16 11:29 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Wed 12/16 11:29 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Rancho Cordova, Brian Fowell* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John L. Burris* *Law Offices of John L. Burris* *7677 Oakport St., Suite 1120* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by E.T. Attorney Burris, John L. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9306313)(Burris, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet