Member Case
Lead case is: 7:20-bk-23280

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:20-bk-23282
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2020
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC
3284 N 29th Ct
Hollywood, FL 33020-1320
Represented By
Fred B. Ringel
Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese &
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Friday, November 22, 2024
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 11/22 11:56 AM
Case Closed. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
27 27 order Order, Final Decree Fri 11/22 11:55 AM
Order signed on 11/18/2024 Re: Final Decree and Order Closing Chapter 11 Cases (Lead case 20-23280 . (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 03, 2022
26 26 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Mon 07/04 12:19 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 07/03/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #25 )
Friday, July 01, 2022
25 25 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Fri 07/01 12:36 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Robert D. Drain to Judge Sean H. Lane. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 06, 2022
24 24 misc Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim Mon 02/07 12:07 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Related [+] . Notice Date 02/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Friday, February 04, 2022
23 23 claims Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES) Fri 02/04 1:42 PM
Transferor: 85 Flatbush Avenue 1 LLC (Claim No. 1) To TH Holdco LLC filed by Lauren M. Macksoud on behalf of TH Holdco LLC. (Macksoud, Lauren)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 02/04 1:45 PM
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES)([LINK 20-23282 rdd] ) [claims,740] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15656766. Fee amount 26.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #23
Monday, February 22, 2021
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Mon 02/22 10:08 AM
Pending Deadlines for Schedules and Statements Terminated. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
22 22 29 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - Official Forms 104/204 Fri 02/19 3:45 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual , - Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204) , Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate parents added to case: 85 Flatbush RHO Mezz LLC., List of Equity Security Holders , Matrix , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b))- Form 2030 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules - Non-Individual Filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
21 21 39 pgs misc Transcript Wed 12/30 10:47 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/22/20 at 2:05 P.M. RE: Notice Of Hearing - Notice Of Rescheduled First Day Hearing Related [+]. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/29/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: J&J COURT TRANSCRIBERS, INC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/5/2021. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/29/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/29/2021. (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-] ument(S)5,6,95 ,6 ,9
Monday, December 28, 2020
20 20 order Motion, Joint Administration Mon 12/28 12:59 PM
Order signed on 12/28/2020 Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and Related Relief Related [+]. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-] 2
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Mon 12/28 1:03 PM
An order has been entered in this case, directing the joint administration of this case with the case of 85 Flatbush RHO Mezz LLC, Case No. 20-23280 rdd (LEAD) and 85 Flatbush RHO Hotel LLC, Case No. 20-23281 rdd. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
19 19 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Thu 12/24 12:18 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 12/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/22 5:26 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Michael Kwiatkowski on behalf of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.. (Kwiatkowski, Michael)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 answer Objection Tue 12/22 4:50 PM
Objection to Motion /Objection Of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc. To The Debtors' Motion (I) Approving Debtors' Proposed Form Of Adequate Assurance Of Payment, (II) Establishing Procedures For Resolving Objections By Utility Companies And (III) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Altering, Refusing Or Discontinuing Service Related [+] filed by Thomas R. Slome on behalf of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.. Objections due by 12/28/2020, (Slome, Thomas)
Related: [-] 4
16 16 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 12/22 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings filed by Jerry A. Montag on behalf of 85 Flatbush Mezz LLC. (Montag, Jerry)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Tue 12/22 2:42 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Michael Ryan Pinkston on behalf of 85 Flatbush Mezz LLC. (Pinkston, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 12/22 2:43 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 20-23282 rdd] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14726641. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #15
Monday, December 21, 2020
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/21 7:27 PM
Certificate of Service of Nathanael F. Meyers Related [+] Filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-] 2 ,4 ,11
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/21 6:37 PM
Certificate of Service of Nathanael F. Meyers Related [+] Filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-] 5 ,6 ,12 ,11
12 12 notice Notice, Hearing Mon 12/21 1:00 PM
Notice of Hearing - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED FIRST DAY HEARING Related [+] filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-] 5 ,6 ,9
11 11 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Mon 12/21 12:29 PM
Notice of Presentment - NOTICE OF PRESENTMENT OF ORDER (I) APPROVING DEBTORS PROPOSED FORM OF ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OF PAYMENT, (II) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING OBJECTIONS BY UTILITY COMPANIES AND (III) PROHIBITING UTILITY COMPANIES FROM ALTERING, REFUSING OR DISCONTINUING SERVICE Related [+] filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. with presentment to be held on 1/4/2021 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Objections due by 12/28/2020, (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-] 4
10 10 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC) Mon 12/21 12:19 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/14/2021 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Walker, Justin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice, Hearing Mon 12/21 11:43 AM
Notice of Hearing - Notice of First Day Hearing Related [+] filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/21 11:35 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Jerold C. Feuerstein on behalf of 85 Flatbush Avenue 1 LLC. (Feuerstein, Jerold)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 12/21 10:01 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jerold C. Feuerstein on behalf of 85 Flatbush Avenue 1 LLC. (Feuerstein, Jerold)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Mon 12/21 9:17 AM
Deficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 2/1/2021. Schedule A/B due 1/4/2021. Schedule D due 1/4/2021. Schedule E/F due 1/4/2021. Schedule G due 1/4/2021. Schedule H due 1/4/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/4/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/4/2021. Atty Disclosure State. due 1/4/2021. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 1/4/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 1/4/2021, (Walker, Justin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 20, 2020
6 6 motion Motion, Authorize Sun 12/20 6:42 PM
Motion to Authorize Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 6003 and 6004 for Interim and Final Authorization (i) to Pay Wages and Compensation and (II) for Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Obligations filed by Lori A. Schwartz on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Schwartz, Lori)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Motion, Approve Use of Cash Collateral Sun 12/20 6:35 PM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by Lori A. Schwartz on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Schwartz, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Interim Order
Friday, December 18, 2020
4 4 motion Motion, Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Services Fri 12/18 5:16 PM
Motion for Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Services and Continuation of Service - CORRECTED DEBTORS' MOTION (I) APPROVING DEBTORS' PROPOSED FORM OF ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OF PAYMENT, (II) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING OBJECTIONS BY UTILITY COMPANIES AND (III) PROHIBITING UTILITY COMPANIES FROM ALTERING, REFUSING OR DISCONTINUING SERVICE [Presentment Date: January 4, 2021 at 12:00 p.m.] filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 10 pgs motion Motion, Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Services Fri 12/18 4:12 PM
Motion for Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Services and Continuation of Service - DEBTORS' MOTION (I) APPROVING DEBTORS' PROPOSED FORM OF ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OF PAYMENT, (II) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING OBJECTIONS BY UTILITY COMPANIES AND (III) PROHIBITING UTILITY COMPANIES FROM ALTERING, REFUSING OR DISCONTINUING SERVICE [Presentment Date: January 4, 2021 at 12:00 p.m.] filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 7 pgs motion Motion, Joint Administration Fri 12/18 4:10 PM
Motion for Joint Administration - APPLICATION PURSUANT TO SECTION 105 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE AND RULE 1015(b) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE FOR ORDER DIRECTING JOINT ADMINISTRATION filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 20 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 12/18 1:24 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/19/2021, Disclosure Statement due by 4/19/2021, Initial Case Conference due by 1/19/2021, Filed by Fred B. Ringel of Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese & on behalf of 85 Flatbush RHO Residential LLC. (Ringel, Fred)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 12/18 1:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-23282 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14709478. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Fri 12/18 1:43 PM
Judge Robert D. Drain added to the case. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association - Related Fri 12/18 1:52 PM
Case Related to 17-22453 East Village Properties LLC. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]