Bingham v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-04391 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Southern, 3:20-cv-02362 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 16, 2021 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwall, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 to 100
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randal Bingham
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 12/18 5:21 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Southern, 3:20-cv-02362, Bingham v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-4391-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 12, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C 10.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2021 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02362. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Files transferred electronically to: *District of South Carolina*.*PO Box 835**Charleston, SC 29402* (jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/18/2020.] |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |