New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:20-mj-08482
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Dec 19, 2020 2:30 AM EST
Defendant
ANTONIO VENTURA (1)
Represented By
PETER MICHAEL CARTER
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
MARK I. COHEN
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MARK JOSEPH PESCE
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/19/2020 3:42 AM EST
Thursday, November 19, 2020
Arrest of ANTONIO VENTURA. (jbb)
Related: [-]
WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by ANTONIO VENTURA placed on the record. (jbb)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to ANTONIO VENTURA (1). (jbb)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Initial Appearance as to ANTONIO VENTURA held on 11/23/2020. Spanish Interpreter sworn. (Court Reporter/Recorder: Zoom) (jbb)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCING as to ANTONIO VENTURA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/19/20. (jbb)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to ANTONIO VENTURA - PETER MICHAEL CARTER for ANTONIO VENTURA appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/19/20. (jbb)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to ANTONIO VENTURA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/19/20. (jbb)
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER as to ANTONIO VENTURA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/19/20. (jbb)
Related: [-]
7 7 SECOND EXTENSION OF STANDING ORDER 20-12 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through January 4, 2021 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/23/20. (jbb)
Related: [-]