Patrick Kennedy et al v. Jeff Bearden et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-11483 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 16, 2021 1:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Acembly, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Bearden
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
P3 Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Synrgy Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
B and D Consulting, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Asadoorian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Exirsoft Thechnology and Development, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
77 | 77
![]() MINUTES OF HEARING re ALTER EGO held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:75 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case. Attorneys state their appearances. The Court stays the case, and moves it to the inactive calendar. Plaintiff's counsel shall notify the Court, in writing, when the matter should be restored to the active calendar. Attorney Michael B. Wilson is relieved as counsel of record. He is ordered to advise his former clients separately that when the matter is restored to the Court's active calendar, they will need to retain new counsel. Case stayed. Attorney Michael B Wilson terminated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
76 | 76
![]() REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Federal Criminal Investigation Relating to Defendant Jeff Bearden 75 filed by Defendant Jeff Bearden. (Wilson, Michael) |
|
75 | 75
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Federal Criminal Investigation Relating to Defendant Jeff Bearden filed by Defendants Jeff Bearden. (Wilson, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 27, 2021 | ||
74 | 74
![]() BRIEF filed by Defendant Jeff Bearden. regarding Miscellaneous Document73 . (Wilson, Michael) |
|
73 | 73
![]() PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO BEARDEN/B&D OPENING BRIEF RE ALTER EGO filed by Plaintiffs Michael Asadoorian, Exirsoft Thechnology and Development, Inc, Patrick Kennedy re: Brief (non-motion non-appeal),70 (Novian, Farhad) |