Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Timothy A Barnes
Case #: 1:20-bk-21793
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Oct 04, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Equestrian Events, LLC
45W015 Welter Road
Maple Park, IL 60151
Represented By
Joshua D. Greene
Springer Larsen Greene, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
360 360 notice Notice of Objection (PDF) Fri 05/09 12:18 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by Mark A Carter on behalf of Silver Bottom, LLC Related [+]. (Carter, Mark)
Related: [-] 356 Motion to Approve
Thursday, May 08, 2025
359 359 utility U - Corrective Entry Thu 05/08 2:51 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PDF/Event Error, Filer Notified Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 357 Motion to Approve
358 358 motion Compensation WITH Notice of Motion Thu 05/08 10:10 AM
Notice of Motion and Application for Compensation for Paul Tomaszewski, Realtor, Fee: $60,000.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Richard G Larsen. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 09:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Larsen, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
357 357 motion Approve Wed 05/07 10:28 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Approve Compensation to Paul Tomaszewski/Keller Williams Filed by Richard G Larsen on behalf of Equestrian Events, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 09:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Larsen, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
356 356 motion Approve Wed 05/07 10:25 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Approve Distribution from Sale Proceeds Filed by Richard G Larsen on behalf of Equestrian Events, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2025 at 09:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 744, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Barnes. (Larsen, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Commission Statement
Att: 2 Proposed Order