New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Douglas E Arpert
Case #: 3:20-cv-19994
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2020
Re-opened:Mar 27, 2023
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 6:48 AM EDT
Defendant
ALL AMERICAN AUTO GROUP, INC.
Represented By
KATHERINE M. DICICCO
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
JAMES J. PANZINI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
NOORIN HAMID
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
WALID ELKHOULY
Represented By
KATHERINE M. DICICCO
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
JAMES J. PANZINI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
NOORIN HAMID
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
WEISLEDER, INC.
Represented By
KATHERINE M. DICICCO
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
JAMES J. PANZINI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
NOORIN HAMID
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
TAMMEY MANDERVILLE
Represented By
DANIEL S. ORLOW
Console Mattiaci Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 27, 2023
35 35 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 03/27 11:37 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL and the Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen the case and make a new and separate docket entry reading CIVIL CASE REOPENED; and it is further this matter is Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/27/2023. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
34 34 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 01/19 3:26 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 3/20/2023. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/19/2023. (jdb)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 01/20 5:43 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Settlement Conference held on 1/19/2023, via Zoom. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
33 33 order Order Tue 12/20 2:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Settlement Conference scheduled for 1/19/2023 at 2:00am will be conducted via Zoom. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/20/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
32 32 misc Letter Wed 12/07 1:15 PM
Letter from Daniel Orlow. (ORLOW, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
31 31 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 11/23 11:59 AM
TEXT ORDER: Granting30 letter request. The Settlement Conference is adjourned to 1/19/2023 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Defendants' insurance carrier may be available via telephone. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/23/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
30 30 misc Letter Mon 11/21 2:53 PM
Letter from James J. Panzini regarding adjournment and request for virtual attendance re 29 Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
29 29 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 11/09 3:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Settlement Conference on 12/15/2022 at 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. The Court will conduct a Final Pretrial Conference on 1/19/2023 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W. The parties' proposed Final Pretrial Order must be submitted to the Court at least 48 hours in advance of the Conference. Prior to appearing, counsel are encouraged to check the Court's website for the status of any COVID-19 precautions required in the courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/9/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
28 28 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 10/20 5:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting27 letter request and adjourning the Final Pretrial Conference to 11/7/2022 at 12:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/20/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Thu 10/20 3:03 PM
Letter from James J. Panzini, Esq., jointly with Plaintiff, requesting adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference re26 Scheduling Order. (PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
26 26 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/29 2:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/29/2022. (jdg)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 08/30 2:17 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/29/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/05 11:32 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 8/29/2022 at 11:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/5/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 31, 2022
24 24 misc Status Report Sun 07/31 2:07 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by TAMMEY MANDERVILLE. (ORLOW, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 07/07 5:46 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/7/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 07/07 6:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: Counsel is to submit a joint status report by 7/31/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/7/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/05 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference previously set for 7/6/2022 has been rescheduled to 7/7/2022 at 4:00 PM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/5/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/23 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA BHUTANI on behalf of ALL AMERICAN AUTO GROUP, INC., WALID ELKHOULY, WEISLEDER, INC. (BHUTANI, POOJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/12 1:06 PM
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/6/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 7/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/12/2022. (jal)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 05/12 1:44 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/12/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/29 5:47 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 5/12/2022 at 10:00 AM. The parties are to submit a joint status report 48 hours in advance. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/29/2022. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 04/08 4:51 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Settlement Conference held on 4/7/2022, in person. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
18 18 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/30 4:14 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the request for a 30-day extension of the current fact discovery deadline of 3/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/30/2022. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/19 11:35 AM
LETTER ORDER granting the Parties' request for a 60-day extension of the deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order. Settlement Conference reset for 4/7/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 01/19/2022. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 11/09 4:29 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/9/2021. (eh, )
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 11/09 5:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: Defendants responses to Plaintiffs outstanding discovery requests must be served by 11/19/21. The deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order dated 4/29/21 (ECF#10 ) are extended an additional 60 days. The Court will conduct a SC on 2/2/22 at 2:00pm in Trenton - Courtroom 6W. Trial counsel and clients with full settlement authority must attend. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/9/2021. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 11/02 6:32 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference previously set for 11/4/2021 has been adjourned to 11/9/2021 at 9:30am. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/2/2021. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/13 1:01 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the parties' request for a 60-day extension of time to complete all necessary depositions and post-deposition supplemental discovery. The Court will conduct a telephone status conference on November 4, 2021, at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/13/2021. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
13 13 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Wed 07/21 3:29 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney KATHERINE M. DICICCO terminated. (DICICCO, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 07/12 5:37 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/12/2021. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
12 12 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/14 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by NOORIN HAMID on behalf of All Defendants (HAMID, NOORIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
11 11 5 pgs order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 04/29 12:14 PM
DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALTY ORDER filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 04/29/2021. (jdb)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 04/29 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/12/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to initiate the call. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties, whether by amended or third party complaint, must be filed by June 30, 2021. All fact discovery, including any third party depositions, is to be complete by September 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 04/29/2021. (jdb)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/29 10:25 AM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/29/2021, via telephone. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
8 8 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 04/08 4:50 PM
ORDER Initial Conference, via telephone, is set for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/8/2021. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/12 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE M. DICICCO on behalf of All Defendants (DICICCO, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
6 6 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/12 11:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(PANZINI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/12 9:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAMMEY MANDERVILLE. WALID ELKHOULY waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/12 9:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAMMEY MANDERVILLE. WEISLEDER, INC. waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/12 9:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAMMEY MANDERVILLE. ALL AMERICAN AUTO GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/21 2:48 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALL AMERICAN AUTO GROUP, INC., WALID ELKHOULY, WEISLEDER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/21 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT against ALL AMERICAN AUTO GROUP, INC., WALID ELKHOULY, WEISLEDER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11854875) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TAMMEY MANDERVILLE.(ORLOW, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 12/21 2:47 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
Related: [-]