Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-42950

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:20-ap-04095
Nature of Suit1 null
2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2020
Terminated:Aug 09, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC
Represented By
UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC
contact info
Defendant
UAH Property Management LP
Represented By
UAH Property Management LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Clark
15110 Layden Farms Ln.
Forney, TX 75126
Represented By
Brett Lee Myers
Wick Phillips
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Monday, August 09, 2021
court Close adversary case Mon 08/09 3:47 PM
Adversary case 4:20-ap-4095 closed (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
16 16 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 07/23 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding with prejudice (related document14 ) Entered on 7/21/2021.
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
15 15 order Dismiss adversary proceeding Wed 07/21 12:31 PM
Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding with prejudice Related [+] Entered on 7/21/2021. (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Wed 07/21 10:05 AM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Joint filed by Plaintiff Victor Clark, Defendants UAH Property Management LP, UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC (Myers, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
13 13 court Hearing held Mon 07/12 2:37 PM
Hearing held on 7/12/2021. Related [+] ***STATUS CONFERENCE HELD. MOTION TO DISMISS TO BE FILED*** (Munoz, Kristina)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-04095 Complaint by Michael Victor Clark against UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC, UAH Property Management LP. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Adversary Civil Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). filed by Plaintiff Victor Clark
Thursday, July 01, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of hearing Thu 07/01 1:48 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Court Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 7/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris. (McCrory, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Victor Clark
Monday, February 01, 2021
11 11 court Hearing held Mon 02/01 3:37 PM
Hearing held on 2/1/2021. Related [+] ***STATUS CONFERENCE HELD*** (Munoz, Kristina)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-04095 Complaint by Michael Victor Clark against UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC, UAH Property Management LP. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Adversary Civil Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment). filed by Plaintiff Victor Clark
Friday, January 29, 2021
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 01/29 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 General Order regarding hearing to be held by WebEx Videoconference only(RE: related document(s) 7 Hearing set/continued). Entered on 1/27/2021
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order (generic) Wed 01/27 2:19 PM
General Order regarding hearing to be held by WebEx Videoconference onl Related [+]. Entered on 1/27/2021 (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-] 7 Hearing set/continued
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 01/19 2:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joe E. Marshall filed by Defendant UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC. (Marshall, Joe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
7 7 court Hearing set/continued Wed 01/13 4:30 PM
Hearing reset Related [+] Status Conference to be held on 2/1/2021 at 01:30 PM at Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm.. (Munoz, Kristina)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-04095 Complaint by Michael Victor Clark against UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC, UAH Property Management LP. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Adversary Civil Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). 91 (Declaratory judgment).
Saturday, January 09, 2021
6 6 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 01/09 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 General Order regarding hearing to be held by WebEx Videoconference (RE: related document(s)3 Notice of hearing). Entered on 1/7/2021
Thursday, January 07, 2021
5 5 2 pgs order Order (generic) Thu 01/07 4:14 PM
General Order regarding hearing to be held by WebEx Videoconference Related [+]. Entered on 1/7/2021 (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of hearing
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
4 4 court BNC certificate of mailing - hearing Wed 12/23 11:27 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - hearing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of hearing filed by Court (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Victor Clark). Status Conference to be held on 1/13/2021 at 01:30 PM at Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm.. (McCrory, J.)
Monday, December 21, 2020
3 3 notice Notice of hearing Mon 12/21 9:20 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Court Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 1/13/2021 at 01:30 PM at Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm.. (McCrory, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Victor Clark
2 2 court Clerk's correspondence Mon 12/21 7:52 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Amended Adversary Coversheet from attorney for plaintiff with Nature of Suit to Match Complaint. Responses due by 12/28/2020. (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/18 2:15 PM
Adversary case 20-04095 Complaint by Michael Victor Clark against UAH-Mayfair Management Group LLC, UAH Property Management LP. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). 14 Related [+]. 91 (Declaratory judgment). (Myers, Brett)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Adversary Civil Cover Sheet