Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:20-cv-02815
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12131 Americans with Disabilities
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Aug 09, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
JAC Products Inc.
c/o CT Corp. System, 4400 Easton Commons Way, Ste. 125
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
Melissa M. Tetreau
Bodman - Troy
contact info
John T. Below
Bodman
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurie Elek
247 Monroe Street
Wauseon, OH 43567
Represented By
Katherine A. Pawlak
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info
Francis J. Landry
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, August 09, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/09 2:14 PM
Stipulation & Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the parties' settlement agreement. Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/9/2021. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
14 14 oth_doc Proposed Order Fri 08/06 3:06 PM
Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by JAC Products Inc.. (Tetreau, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 07/08 3:42 PM
Minutes of Settlement Conference [non-document] held on 7/8/2021 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiff appeared with attorney Francis J. Landry; attorney Melissa M. Tetreau appeared for Defendant with Jodee Szozda, Anna Norman, and Mike Galico. Case settled. Dismissal entry to be filed within 30 days. (Court Reporter: Stacey Kiprotich.) Time: 2.5 hours. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 06/24 1:41 PM
Random Re-assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,G)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
13 13 4 pgs order Order Tue 03/16 12:29 PM
Order. Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted via email to Knepp_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 7/2/2021. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/16/2021. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Tue 03/16 12:28 PM
Case Management Conference Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties shall exchange Rule 26(a) disclosure by 4/17/2021. Liability & Damages discovery due by 11/15/2021. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 5/28/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2021. Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 318 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/16/2021. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
minutes Case Management Conference Mon 03/15 11:27 AM
Minutes of Case Management Conference [non-document] held telephonically on 3/15/2021 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Attorney Francis J. Landry attended for Plaintiff; Attorney Melissa M. Tetreau for Defendant. Case Management Conference Order(s) to follow. Time: 15 minutes. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
11 11 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 03/10 8:24 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Laurie Elek. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
10 10 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 02/23 10:45 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice. Case Management Conference to be held telephonically on 3/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 2/23/2021. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Monday, February 22, 2021
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 02/22 10:25 AM
Attorney Appearance by John T. Below filed by on behalf of JAC Products Inc.. (Below, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Mon 02/22 9:53 AM
Order [non-document] granting6 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney John T. Below for JAC Products Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 2/22/2021. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/19 3:04 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by JAC Products Inc.. (Tetreau, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 02/19 3:02 PM
Attorney Appearance by Melissa M. Tetreau filed by on behalf of JAC Products Inc.. (Tetreau, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/12 3:26 PM
Motion for attorney John T. Below to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 34660012273, filed by Defendant JAC Products Inc..(K,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/20 3:22 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Laurie Elek. JAC Products Inc. waiver sent on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021 filed on behalf of Laurie Elek (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Mon 12/28 10:23 AM
Order granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Judge James R. Knepp II on 12/28/2020. (S,JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
3 3 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 12/23 10:38 AM
Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Laurie Elek. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/22 9:45 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Application Form AO239) filed by Plaintiff Laurie Elek. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/22 9:43 AM
Complaint with jury demand against JAC Products Inc. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Laurie Elek. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A-Copy of EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Copy of Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 12/22 12:29 PM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 12/22 12:41 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Tue 12/22 12:45 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
Related: [-]