Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:William O Bertelsman
Referred: Candace J Smith
Case #: 2:20-cv-00183
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Jul 06, 2021
Case in other court:Boone Circuit Court, 20-CI-01291
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 5:27 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Cross Claimant
P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Cross Claimant
Early A. Andrews, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Cross Claimant
Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Jack S. Gatlin
Gatlin Voelker, PLLC
contact info
Charles Nicholson Benson
Benson & Schultz, Psc
contact info
Cross Defendant
P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Cross Defendant
Early A. Andrews, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Cross Defendant
Hyundai Translead
Represented By
John L. Tate
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Andrew Joseph Poltorak
Stites & Harbison Pllc - Covington
contact info
Cross Defendant
P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Defendant
P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Defendant
P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Defendant
Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Jack S. Gatlin
Gatlin Voelker, PLLC
contact info
Charles Nicholson Benson
Benson & Schultz, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Hyundai Translead
Represented By
John L. Tate
Stites & Harbison, Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Andrew Joseph Poltorak
Stites & Harbison Pllc - Covington
contact info
Defendant
Early A. Andrews, Jr.
Represented By
Elizabeth Johnson Winchell
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Daniel E. Murner
Landrum & Shouse Llp - Lexington
contact info
Executor plaintiff
Barry H. Davis
Represented By
Jordan Dallas Turner
contact info
Jordan Ann Turner
Dallas & Turner, PLLC
contact info
Andrew Ralph Young
The Law Firm For Truck Safety LLP
contact info
James Ryan Turner
Dallas & Turner, PLLC
contact info
Don John Young, III
The Law Firm For Truck Safety LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Betty T. Davis
Represented By
Jordan Dallas Turner
contact info
Jordan Ann Turner
Dallas & Turner, PLLC
contact info
Andrew Ralph Young
The Law Firm For Truck Safety LLP
contact info
James Ryan Turner
Dallas & Turner, PLLC
contact info
Don John Young, III
The Law Firm For Truck Safety LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barry H. Davis
Represented By
Andrew Ralph Young
The Law Firm For Truck Safety LLP
contact info
James Ryan Turner
Dallas & Turner, PLLC
contact info
Don John Young, III
The Law Firm For Truck Safety LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
30 30 4 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Term Case Tue 07/06 3:24 PM
ORDER: (1) Plaintiffs' motion to remand to state court and to withdraw plaintiffs' previously filed Rule 41 motion25 be, and is hereby, GRANTED ; (2) Plaintiff's motion to dismiss17 be, and is hereby, WITHDRAWN ; and (3) This case be, and is hereby, REMANDED TO BOONE CIRCUIT COURT . Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/6/2021.(ECO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
utility Motion Submitted Tue 03/23 9:37 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re25 MOTION to Remand by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis MOTION to Withdraw (ECO)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/22 10:12 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION to Remand by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis MOTION to Withdraw filed by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis. (Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/10 3:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Remand by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis MOTION to Withdraw filed by Early A. Andrews, Jr, P.A.M. Transport, Inc., P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC. (Murner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/09 4:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Remand by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis MOTION to Withdraw filed by Hyundai Translead. (Poltorak, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
26 26 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/19 10:10 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION to Remand by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis MOTION to Withdraw filed by Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Gatlin, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
utility File Submitted Wed 02/17 9:00 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review:24 Joint Status Report (ECO)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docket Modification Wed 02/17 9:07 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO James Turner re25 MOTION to Remand and MOTION to Withdraw; Error: This motion requests 2 forms of relief and only oneform of relief was selected; Entry by attorney; Clerk added the motion reliefrequested. In the future, when filing a motion with multiple reliefs, select amotion relief for each relief requested, so all motions will appear on theJudge's motion report. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
25 25 motion Remand Tue 02/16 11:21 AM
MOTION to Remand by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis(Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 misc Status Report Tue 02/16 11:20 AM
STATUS REPORT by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis. (Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
22 22 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/21 5:02 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting19 MOTION for Andrew Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiffs Barry H. Davis, as Administrator for the Estate of Allyson B. Davis, Barry H. Davis, and Betty T. Davis, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/21/2021. (TJZ)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/21 5:01 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting20 MOTION for Don. J. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Plaintiffs Barry H. Davis, as Administrator for the Estate of Allyson B. Davis, Barry H. Davis, and Betty T. Davis, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/21/2021. (TJZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
misc Bar Status Check Wed 01/20 10:30 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Andrew Ralph Young, Don John Young, III re20 MOTION for Don. J. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4874640),19 MOTION for for Andrew Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4874631). (ECO)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 01/20 10:30 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re20 MOTION for Don. J. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4874640),19 MOTION for for Andrew Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4874631) (ECO)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Note Wed 01/20 10:55 AM
Clerk's Note: Clerk verified with counsel that page 4 of the20 MOTION for Don. J. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice is indeed a blank page. (ECO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/19 11:56 AM
MOTION for Don. J. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4874640)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/19 11:55 AM
MOTION for for Andrew Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4874631)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 01/19 8:54 AM
ORDER: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE set for 2/2/2021 at 03:00 PM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. Counsel should connect 5 minutes before the conference is scheduled to begin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/19/2021.(TJZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
17 17 motion Dismiss Tue 01/12 1:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis as to Defendant Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company(Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/12 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Ryan Turner (Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
15 15 answer Answer to Crossclaim Thu 01/07 3:23 PM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company by Hyundai Translead.(Poltorak, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Crossclaim Thu 01/07 3:21 PM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by P.A.M. Cartage Carriers, LLC, P.A.M. Transport, Inc and Early A. Andrews, Jr. by Hyundai Translead.(Poltorak, Andrew)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Thu 01/07 3:06 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hyundai Translead. (Poltorak, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 01/07 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Andrew Poltorak.5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Hyundai Translead without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
misc Clerk's Note Wed 01/06 9:52 AM
Clerk's Note re11 Notice: Case record updated to reflect counsel's correct name as admitted in EDKY, Jordan Ann Turner. Counsel advised to use name as listed in admission records on future pleadings to avoid confusion. (STC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
11 11 notice Other Notice Tue 01/05 12:31 PM
NOTICE by Barry H. Davis, Barry H. Davis, Betty T. Davis of Attorney Jordan Dallas Turner (Turner, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
10 10 discov Disclosures Mon 01/04 3:23 PM
FIRST DISCLOSURES Rule 7.1 by Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company.(Gatlin, Jack)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Crossclaim Mon 01/04 7:39 AM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Kentucky Farm Bureau by Early A. Andrews, Jr, P.A.M. Transport, Inc., P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC.(Murner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Mon 01/04 10:02 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review:9 Answer to Crossclaim (SLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Wed 12/30 3:46 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P.A.M. Transport, Inc., P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC. (Murner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/30 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Charles Benson/Jack Gatlin. Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, has been filed by Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/30 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Daniel Murner/Elizabeth Winchell. Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim has been filed by P.A.M. Cartage Carriers LLC and P.A.M. Transport, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Wed 12/30 8:46 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, (ECO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
5 5 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 12/29 3:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hyundai Translead. (Poltorak, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
4 4 notice Attorney Notice Mon 12/28 1:49 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jordan Dallas Turner by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(ECO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Atty Data Sheet - No record found
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/22 12:57 PM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC § 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 12/22 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-01291. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4857665), filed by Hyundai Translead.(ECO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 38 pgs Exhibit A-State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-Answer and Cross Claim KFB,
Att: 5 Exhibit C-Answer and Cross Claim PAM,
Att: 6 Exhibit D-Notice of Substitution of Counsel,
Att: 7 Exhibit E-Notice of Service of Discoveroy
misc Conflict Check Tue 12/22 12:53 PM
Conflict Check run. (ECO)
Related: [-]
ANSWER to Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Early A. Andrews, P.A.M. Transport, Inc., P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC, Hyundai Translead by Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. ( Filed as part of State Court Record DE # 1 , Exhibit B ). (ECO) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ECO).
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Tue 12/22 2:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Hyundai Translead by Early A. Andrews, P.A.M. Transport, Inc., P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC. ( Filed as part of State Court Record DE 1 Exhibit C). (ECO)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Tue 12/22 2:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Early A. Andrews, P.A.M. Transport, Inc., P.A.M.Cartage Carriers LLC, Hyundai Translead by Kentucky Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. ( Filed as part of State Court Record DE # 1 , Exhibit B ). (ECO) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ECO)
Related: [-]