California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:20-cv-02400
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 2:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Balt USA, LLC
Represented By
Alexander Ding Zeng
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
William Oscar Adams
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Sheila N Swaroop
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Paul A. Stewart
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Nicholas Andrew Belair
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Ferrera
Represented By
William J Brown, Jr
Brown Wegner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Gong
Represented By
Spencer Winston Ririe
Mangum Ririe LLP
contact info
Rustin Kent Mangum
Mangum Ririe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Yoshitaka Katayama
Represented By
Nathaniel E Durrance
Newman Du Wors LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nguyen Jake Le
Represented By
Sheila N Swaroop
Knobbe Martens Olson And Bear LLP
contact info
Mark A Finkelstein
Umberg Zipser LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Microvention, Inc.
Represented By
Evan Finkel
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Chaz Matthew Hales
Pillsbury Withrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Chloe Stepney
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Michelle A Herrera
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Michael S Horikawa
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Callie A Bjurstrom
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
819 819 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 04/29 11:10 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton the Court GRANTS the request to enter the attached Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction813 . (jp)
Related: [-]
818 818 judgmentCV Judgment - Consent Mon 04/29 11:07 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS DAVID FERRERA, NGUYEN "JAKE" LE, AND MICHELLE TRAN by Judge Josephine L. Staton. It is hereby ORDERED, pursuant to FRCP 65, that Ferrera, Le and Tran and their affiliates, business partners, officers, agents, servants and employees, and all others acting in concert or participation with them, be enjoined and restrained. See document for further information. No appeals shall be taken from this Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction, and the parties waive all rights to appeal. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
817 817 order Leave to File Document Under Seal Mon 04/29 11:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Microvention, Inc.'s APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in support of Amended Joint Stipulation for Entry of Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction (Doc.811 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
816 816 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/19 7:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Microvention, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,812 [Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission re Michelle Tran, only] served on April 19, 2024. (Herrera, Michelle)
Related: [-]
815 815 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/19 7:22 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Microvention, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,812 [Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission re Nguyen (Jake) Le, only] served on April 19, 2024. (Herrera, Michelle)
Related: [-]
814 814 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/19 7:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Microvention, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,812 [Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission re David Ferrera, only] served on April 19, 2024. (Herrera, Michelle)
Related: [-]
813 813 5 pgs stip Order Fri 04/19 7:00 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order [Amended Joint Stipulation for Entry of Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction] filed by plaintiff Microvention, Inc..(Herrera, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants David Ferrera, Ngyuen Jake Le, and Michelle Tran
812 812 attyseal Sealed Declaration in Support Fri 04/19 6:41 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document [Plaintiff MicroVention, Inc.s Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Amended Joint Stipulation for Entry of Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction] under seal811 filed by Plaintiff Microvention, Inc..(Herrera, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants David Ferrera, Ngyuen Jake Le, and Michelle Tran,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 toProposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants David Ferrera, Ngyuen Jake Le, and Michelle Tran,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Proposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants David Ferrera, Ngyuen Jake Le, and Michelle Tran
811 811 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Fri 04/19 6:31 PM
APPLICATION to file document [Plaintiff MicroVention, Inc.s Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Amended Joint Stipulation for Entry of Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction] under seal filed by Plaintiff Microvention, Inc..(Herrera, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants David Ferrera, Ngyuen Jake Le, and Michelle Tran,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Proposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants David Ferrera, Ngyuen Jake Le, and Michelle Tran,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Proposed Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants David Ferrera, Ngyuen Jake Le, and Michelle Tran