Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:20-cv-02926
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Oct 12, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 5:28 AM CDT
Defendant
DS Services of America, Inc.
Represented By
Jamie K Durrett
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
James Mitchell Burd
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Temiika Gipson
Circuit Court, 30th Judicial District Shelby County Courthouse 140 Adams Ave, Rm 224
Memphis, TN 38103
Plaintiff
81 Monroe Investment Company, LTD
Represented By
Zachary M Jett
Butler Weihmuller Kratz Craig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Crump Firm Inc.
Represented By
Zachary M Jett
Butler Weihmuller Kratz Craig, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
21 21 order Judgment Tue 10/12 11:42 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/12/2021. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 11, 2021
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/11 12:58 PM
NOTICE by DS Services of America, Inc. Agreed Order of Dismissal (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/11 12:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by DS Services of America, Inc.. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 09/15 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by DS Services of America, Inc. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
17 17 order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 07/29 4:43 PM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] The parties jointly move to stay all scheduling order deadlines for 45 days while the parties discuss resolution of this matter. (ECF No.16 at PageID 69.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Court stays all scheduling order deadlines for 45 days. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 7/29/2021. (ljt)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Stay Thu 07/29 2:53 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay of Scheduling Order Deadlines by DS Services of America, Inc.. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/22 12:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 04/22/2021. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Setting Letter Thu 04/22 11:17 AM
SETTING LETTER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2022 at09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 04/22 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/22/2021. Zachary Jett appeared for the Plaintiffs. Jamie Durrett and James Burd appeared for the Defendant. The Court set scheduling dates. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2022 at09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Catherine Phillips) (mlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 04/16 10:22 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
11 11 notice Setting Letter Fri 03/26 10:25 AM
SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215. (mlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/04 10:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DS Services of America, Inc..(Burd, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/26 4:49 PM
NOTICE by DS Services of America, Inc. of Substitution of Counsel (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/08 8:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by 81 Monroe Investment Company, LTD. (Jett, Zachary)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/08 8:33 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Crump Firm Inc.. (Jett, Zachary)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/08 8:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary M Jett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jett, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Wed 12/23 7:29 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Wed 12/23 7:29 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice LR 16.2 Wed 12/23 7:29 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 12/23 7:28 AM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 12/22 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DS SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC., from IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE THIRTIETH JUDICIAL DISTRICT IN AND FOR SHELBY COUNTY, TENNESSEE CIVIL DIVISION, case number CT-4779-20 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3510885), filed by DS SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.,.(Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1: Monroe Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal