New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:20-cv-10853
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Jan 04, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
NRM Acquisition II LLC
Defendant
NRM Acquisition LLC
Defendant
New Residential Investment Corporation
Defendant
New Residential Mortgage LLC
Defendant
Shellpoint Partners LLC
Defendant
Newrez LLC
Plaintiff
Nicole Cannon
Represented By
Adrian Gucovschi
Gucovschi Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ross Dutcher
Represented By
Adrian Gucovschi
Gucovschi Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, January 04, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/04 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) NRM Acquisition II LLC, NRM Acquisition LLC, New Residential Investment Corporation, New Residential Mortgage LLC, Newrez LLC, Shellpoint Partners LLC. Document filed by Ross Dutcher, Nicole Cannon. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
15 15 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/23 1:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Wed 12/23 12:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Newrez LLC..(dnh)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Wed 12/23 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shellpoint Partners LLC..(dnh)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 12/23 12:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NRM Acquisition II LLC..(dnh)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 12/23 12:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NRM Acquisition LLC..(dnh)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 12/23 12:23 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Residential Mortgage LLC..(dnh)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 12/23 12:21 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Residential Investment Corporation..(dnh)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/23 10:12 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NewRez, LLC, re:2 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Cannon, Ross Dutcher..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/23 10:09 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shellpoint Partners, LLC, re:2 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Cannon, Ross Dutcher..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/23 10:07 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NRM Acquisition II, LLC, re:2 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Cannon, Ross Dutcher..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/23 10:06 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NRM Acquisition, LLC, re:2 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Cannon, Ross Dutcher..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/23 10:04 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New Residential Mortgage LLC, re:2 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Cannon, Ross Dutcher..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/23 10:02 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New Residential Investment Corporation, re:2 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Cannon, Ross Dutcher..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 12/23 11:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adrian Gucovschi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ross Dutcher ; Newrez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 12/23 11:58 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adrian Gucovschi to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/23 12:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Adrian Gucovschi. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 12/23 12:13 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 12/23 12:14 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 12/23 12:14 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 12/23 12:36 AM
COMPLAINT against NRM Acquisition II LLC, NRM Acquisition LLC, New Residential Investment Corporation, New Residential Mortgage LLC, Newrez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Shellpoint Partners LLC. Document filed by Ross Dutcher, Nicole Cannon..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/22 11:26 PM
COMPLAINT against NRM Acquisition II LLC, NRM Acquisition LLC, New Residential Investment Corporation, New Residential Mortgage LLC, Newrez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Shellpoint Partners LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23163433)Document filed by Ross Dutcher..(Gucovschi, Adrian)
Related: [-]