Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Barbara M G Lynn
Case #: 3:20-cv-03710
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 28, 2022
Case in other court:101st District Court, Dallas County, Texas, DC-20-18622
Last checked: Monday Jun 21, 2021 4:37 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Coyote Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By
Ninna Marie Salom
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Darrell W Cook
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stephen W Davis
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Counter Claimant
Les Patterson
Represented By
Ninna Marie Salom
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Darrell W Cook
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stephen W Davis
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Counter Defendant
Quail Energy Services LP
Represented By
Joseph Kelly Watts
Hanszen Laporte
contact info
Defendant
Coyote Oilfield Services LLC
Through Attorney of Record Darrell W. Cook 6688 North Central Expressway, Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75206
Represented By
Ninna Marie Salom
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Darrell W Cook
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stephen W Davis
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Les Patterson
Through attorney of record Darrell W. Cook 6688 North Central Expressway, Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75206
Represented By
Ninna Marie Salom
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Darrell W Cook
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stephen W Davis
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Quail Energy Services LP
Through Attorney of Record Joseph K. Watts Hanzen Laporte, LLP 14201 Memorial Drive
Houston, TX 77079
Represented By
Joseph Kelly Watts
Hanszen Laporte
contact info
Andrew Jee
Jee Law PLLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Tim Allen
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Coyote Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By
Ninna Marie Salom
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Darrell W Cook
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stephen W Davis
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Les Patterson
Represented By
Ninna Marie Salom
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Darrell W Cook
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stephen W Davis
Darrell W Cook & Associates, A Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, February 17, 2023
65 65 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Fri 02/17 10:35 AM
ORDER granting the64 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice: All claims that Plaintiff, Defendants, and Third-Party Defendant asserted, or could have asserted, against any party in this lawsuit are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys fees are borne by the party incurring the same. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/17/2023) (twd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
64 64 motion Dismiss Thu 02/16 3:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Tim Allen, Quail Energy Services LP (Laporte, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order