California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:20-cv-11578
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 22, 2021 1:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Deputy Paul Barrie
Defendant
County of San Bernardino
Represented By
Heidi Kathleen Williams
San Bernardino County Counsel Office
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Deputy K. Sutton
Plaintiff
Jaaye Person-Lynn
Represented By
Yalda Paydar
Ive Mcneill Wyatt Purcell And Diggs Aplc
contact info
Na'Shaun Neal
Plc Law Group Apc
contact info
Rodney S Diggs
Ivie Mcneill Wyatt Purcell And Diggs Aplc
contact info
Megan R Gyongyos
Ivie Mcneill Wyatt Purcell And Diggs
contact info
Peter Laurence Carr, IV
Plc Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
179 179 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 06/24 2:10 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: NEW TRIAL DATE176 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court sets the following dates: Final Pre-Trial Conference September 29, 2025. Jury Trial October 14, 2025. (rolm)
Related: [-]