Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-32145

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John P Gustafson
Case #: 3:20-ap-03069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Feb 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Discover Bank
Discover Financial Services 2500 Lake Cook Road
Riverwoods, IL 60015
Represented By
Discover Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Cafferty
500 Madison Avenue, Suite 320
Toledo, OH 43604
Represented By
Thomas E. Cafferty
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
court ADI Receipt of Complaint Wed 05/05 1:33 PM
Receipt of Complaint 20-03069
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 02/05 7:47 AM
Disposition of Adversary 3:20-ap-3069 (mknei)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/05 7:49 AM
Adversary Case 3:20-ap-3069 Closed (mknei)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/04 11:06 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Thomas E. Cafferty. (Cafferty, Thomas tr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 25, 2020
6 6 BNC Notice of Order on Application to Defer Payment Sat 12/26 12:18 AM
Notice of Order on Application to Defer Payment w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/23 3:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Discover Bank 12/23/2020 (Cafferty, Thomas tr)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Issued Wed 12/23 1:20 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Discover Bank Answer due 1/22/2021. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #1 Toledo. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. (mhutt)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Defer Payment Wed 12/23 11:35 AM
Order Granting Application to Defer Payment (RE #2 ) Signed on 12/23/2020. (mknei crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
2 2 motion Defer Fee Tue 12/22 5:21 PM
Application to Defer Fee Filed by Thomas E. Cafferty Related [+] (Cafferty, Thomas tr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/22 5:21 PM
Adversary case 20-03069 Complaint by Thomas E. Cafferty against Discover Bank. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Cafferty, Thomas tr)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference