New York Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Wolford
Referred: Mark W Pedersen
Case #: 6:20-cv-07118
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2020
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jun 21, 2021 6:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Wayne County
Wayne County 16 William Street
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Correctional Officer Rose
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Brownell
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Corey
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Geer
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Lewellyn
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Santell
Wayne County Sheriff's Department 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Sgt. Verplank
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Verkey
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Welch
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff Deputy Senecal
Wayne County Sheriff's Office 7376 New York-31
Lyons, NY 14489
Represented By
Patrick B. Naylon
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Steven V. Modica
Plaintiff
Bryan Lyle
1950 State Route 31 Apt. 348
Macedon, NY 14502
Represented By
Thomas J. Rzepka
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
91 91 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/28 1:04 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/28/25. (RE)
Related: [-]
90 90 misc Stipulation Tue 01/28 11:46 AM
STIPULATION of Discontinuance by Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Corey, Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Lewellyn, Wayne County Sheriff Deputy Senecal. (Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
89 89 misc Letter Tue 01/28 11:23 AM
Letter filed by Bryan Lyle . (Rzepka, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
88 88 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/24 12:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re86 MOTION in Limine filed by Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Corey, Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Lewellyn, Wayne County Sheriff Deputy Senecal.(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Depo Excerpts,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Miller Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Pltf MOL,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service
utility E-Filing Notification Wrong Event Used Fri 01/24 2:21 PM
E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Objections or Response/Reply event. No action required.87 MOTION Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions re85 Proposed Jury Instructions. Clerk to modify entry and term motion. (TF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
87 87 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/23 11:30 AM
MOTION Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions re85 Proposed Jury Instructions by Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Corey, Wayne County Sheriff Correctional Officer Lewellyn, Wayne County Sheriff Deputy Senecal.(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
86 86 motion In Limine Tue 01/21 4:45 PM
AFFIRMATION in re73 MOTION in Limine by Bryan Lyle.(Rzepka, Thomas) Modified on 1/21/2025 (JHF)
Related: [-]
85 85 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Tue 01/21 4:42 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Bryan Lyle. (Rzepka, Thomas)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Tue 01/21 5:16 PM
E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of83 to "Declaration" and86 to "Affirmation" to reflect correct filing events. (JHF)
Related: [-]