PacerMonitor
A Fitch Solutions Service
Features
Plans & Pricing
About
Home
Features
Pricing
Getting Started
About Us
Start Free Trial
Sign In
Admin Login
Stephanie Lynne Correa
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Case #:
0:20-bk-23935
Case Filed:
Dec 23, 2020
Docket
Parties
Related Cases (5)
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Adversary
0:21-ap-01261 - Correa v. Edfinancial Services, U.S. Dept of Ed.
08/04/2021
Adversary
0:21-ap-01270 - Correa v. Bogen et al
08/16/2021
Adversary
0:21-ap-01300 - Correa v. East Coast Bobcat Service, Inc. et al
09/20/2021
Adversary
0:23-ap-01037 - Correa v. East Coast Bobcat Service, Inc et al
03/02/2023
Adversary
0:23-ap-01076 - Correa v. Bogen, Esq. et al
03/31/2023
Create an account to get the full docket for this case.
Continue to Create Account