Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:20-cv-01991
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Oct 01, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
MPOWER DIRECT, LLC
Represented By
Courtney K. Mazzio
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Sean R. Riley
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
MPOWER ENERGY, LLC
Represented By
Courtney K. Mazzio
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Sean R. Riley
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SARAH CROSKEY
Represented By
Derrek William Cummings
Weisberg Cummings, P.C.
contact info
Stephen T. Mahan, Jr.
Weisberg Cummings, PC
contact info
Larry A. Weisberg
Weisberg Cummings, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 04, 2022
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Fri 02/04 11:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SARAH CROSKEY. (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
27 27 order Order Thu 01/13 10:52 AM
ORDER OF COURT re:26 Notice. The request to extend jurisdiction is granted. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/13/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
26 26 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Wed 01/12 10:02 AM
NOTICE Second Request to Extend Jurisdiction by SARAH CROSKEY re 25 Order, (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
25 25 order Order Mon 11/22 1:43 PM
ORDER OF COURT re:24 . The request to extend jurisdiction is granted. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/22/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Mon 11/22 1:15 PM
NOTICE Request to Extend Jurisdiction by SARAH CROSKEY re 23 Order,, Terminate Civil Case, (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
23 23 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 10/01 11:13 AM
ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of22 Notice of Settlement, the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this CASE CLOSED. Any party may reopen this case upon the filing of a motion within 60 days. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/01/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 10/01 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by SARAH CROSKEY (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 06/30 8:47 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Maria Greco Danaher is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 09/30/21. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/30/21. (eca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
20 20 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Tue 06/29 9:11 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC. (Mazzio, Courtney)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 06/29 2:22 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC. (Mazzio, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/15 11:53 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC, filed by SARAH CROSKEY. (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Tue 06/15 10:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 06/29/21. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/15/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Case Management Order Tue 06/15 10:42 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 08/30/21; Joinder of Parties due 08/30/21; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 06/30/21; Expert Reports by 11/30/21; Rebuttal Reports by 12/30/21; Discovery ends 01/31/22; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 01/31/22 at 10:30 AM; Call parameters outlined herein; Fee records due by the 28th of each month; First disclosure due by 07/28/21; Summary Judgment due by 02/28/22; Response to Summary Judgment due by 03/28/22; Reply brief due by 04/12/22; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/15/21. (eca)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 06/15 10:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/15/2021. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Order Tue 06/15 9:54 AM
Proposed Order by SARAH CROSKEY. (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 06/15 3:25 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MPOWER DIRECT, LLC on 6/29/2021; MPOWER ENERGY, LLC on 6/29/2021 (jjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 06/04 3:20 PM
STIPULATION Selecting ADR Process by SARAH CROSKEY. (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 06/04 3:19 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Fri 05/07 12:19 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC. (Mazzio, Courtney)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/07 7:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Riley on behalf of MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC. (Riley, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 03, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/03 10:15 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 5/24/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 6/4/2021. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 05/03/21. (eca)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Mon 05/03 7:43 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re8 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 5/10/2021. (jjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/30 3:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC. (Mazzio, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/29 9:03 AM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer by 04/30/21. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 03/29/21. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/26 3:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC. (Mazzio, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 26, 2021
5 5 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Fri 02/26 8:16 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SARAH CROSKEY. MPOWER DIRECT, LLC served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Fri 02/26 8:15 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SARAH CROSKEY. MPOWER ENERGY, LLC served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 01/26 10:43 PM
Summons Issued as to MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC (jv)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Tue 01/26 12:41 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SARAH CROSKEY (Cummings, Derrek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 12/23 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against MPOWER DIRECT, LLC, MPOWER ENERGY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6182005), filed by SARAH CROSKEY. (jjg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet