New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00692
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2020
Terminated:Oct 28, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Dec 24, 2020 2:18 AM EST
Defendant
Eric Ian Whitehead (1)
Represented By
Michael Joseph Alber
Law Offices Of Michael J. Alber, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mitzi Steiner
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/01/2022 11:18 PM EST
Monday, December 07, 2020
1 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Eric Ian Whitehead. (jm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
Case Designated ECF as to Eric Ian Whitehead. (jm)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: AUSA Steiner is present. AUSA Jeremy Rosenman present. PTSO Bostic present. Deft. present with attorney Michael Alber. Defendant waives physical appearance and consents to proceed by video conference. Defendant waives indictment. Arraignment as to Eric Ian Whitehead (1) Count 1 held on 12/22/2020. Plea entered by Eric Ian Whitehead (1) Count 1Eric Ian Whitehead (1) Guilty as to Count 1., As to Eric Ian Whitehead. Bail is on separate order. ( Sentencing set for 4/9/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Court Reporter Martha Martin) (jm)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Eric Ian Whitehead (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Eric Ian Whitehead. (jm)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Eric Ian Whitehead. This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. For purposes of this Order, the Government includes all current or former federal, state, and local prosecutors, law-enforcement officers, and other officers who have participated in the prosecution, or investigation that led to the prosecution, of the offense or offenses with which the defendant is charged. The Government has an affirmative obligation to seek from such sources all information subject to disclosure under this Order (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/22/20)(jw)
Related: [-]