Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin Beaton
Referred: Regina S Edwards
Case #: 3:20-cv-00857
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2020
Terminated:Aug 16, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 21, 2021 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Kentucky Commission on Human Rights
Represented By
Michael D. Ekman
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info
Colt C. Sells
Kentucky Commission On Human Rights
contact info
Defendant
Louisville Legal Aid Society
Represented By
Michael D. Ekman
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info
Mark S. Fenzel
Middleton Reutlinger
contact info
Sherry L. Hurley
Middleton Reutlinger
contact info
Nicholas G. Evans
Middleton Reutlinger
contact info
Defendant
Louisville Metro Authority
Represented By
Michael D. Ekman
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
Louisville Metro Government
Represented By
Michael D. Ekman
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By
Michael D. Ekman
U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Cecil Calhoun
7703 Royalty Ave., Apt B
Louisville, KY 40222


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
42 42 order Judgment Wed 08/17 10:00 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Court's order (DN 41 ), the Court enters final judgment in favor of the Defendants and dismisses the case with prejudice. cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
41 41 minutes ~Util - Terminate Case Order - TEXT ONLY Tue 08/16 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the motion to dismiss this case for failure to prosecute (DN39 ) under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Plaintiff did not respond to the motion or to the Court's subsequent order to file a response to the motion or a status report (DN 40 ). In fact, the Plaintiff has not taken any action in this case for nearly a year. See DN37 . Further, it's unclear whether the Plaintiff served the Complaint on the only remaining defendant as required by Rules 4(c) and 4(l). The Plaintiff's repeated failure to prosecute this case constitutes willfulness, so the Court dismisses the complaint. A final judgment will follow. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
order Order - TEXT ONLY Tue 07/26 4:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of Legal Aid Society's Motion to Dismiss for lack of prosecution (DN39 ), the Court orders Louisville Metro and Calhoun to either respond to the motion or else file a status report regarding this litigation by 8/16/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
39 39 motion Dismiss Thu 06/23 12:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Louisville Legal Aid Society (Fenzel, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 07, 2021
38 38 appeal USCA Order Tue 10/12 10:30 AM
ORDER of USCA 6th Circuit as to33 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Cecil Calhoun: It is ordered that this appeal is DISMISSED for lack of appellate jurisdiction. David W. McKeague, Circuit Judge; Raymond M. Kethledge, Circuit Judge and Chad A. Readler, Circuit Judge. NO MANDATE TO ISSUE. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover letter
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/07 4:25 PM
NOTICE of filing by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 09/07 4:24 PM
Filing fee: $ 505.00, receipt number L33067817 (Ferguson, Kim)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/07 4:23 PM
NOTICE of filing by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
35 35 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 09/03 12:51 PM
USCA Case Number 21-5839 for33 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Cecil Calhoun. (DLW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
34 34 notice Deficiency Thu 09/02 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency re33 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. filing fee not paid/IFP motion not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/4/2021. (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
32 32 order Order on Findings of Fact Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 09/01 8:27 AM
Text Order: Magistrate Judge Edwards issued a report (DN31 ) recommending that the Court grant motions to dismiss filed by three Defendants in this case--the Kentucky Commission on Human Rights (DN8 ), U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (DN11 ), and Legal Aid Society (DN12 ). No party has objected to the recommendation, nor did the Plaintiff previously respond to the underlying motions. The Court therefore adopts Magistrate Judge Edwards' Report and Recommendation (DN31 ) as the opinion of the Court. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C) (the court reviews de novo "those portions of the [magistrate judge's] report or specified proposed findings or recommendations to which objection is made") (emphasis added). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
31 31 motion Findings of Fact Fri 07/30 10:32 AM
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 7/29/2021. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendant Kentucky Commission on Human Rights', Defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development's, and Defendant Legal Aid Society, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss (DN8 ,11 ,12 ) be GRANTED. Objections to Findings of Fact due by 8/13/2021. cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/04 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Louisville Legal Aid Society (Fenzel, Mark)
Related: [-]
29 29 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Hearing Fri 06/04 11:20 AM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 6/4/2021. Defendant HUDs Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint6 is DENIED as moot. Calhoun's Motion for Hearing10 is DENIED. cc: Counsel, Cecil Calhoun (as directed.)(JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
utility Docket Correction Tue 05/11 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re28 Notice (Other); Error:Incorrect filers selected; Correction:Filer corrected to HUD; text modified by Clerk. (MLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/10 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Return of Mail by Kentucky Commission on Human Rights, Louisville Legal Aid Society, Louisville Metro Authority, Louisville Metro Government, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development re9 Letter (Ekman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Returned mail
Monday, April 19, 2021
27 27 misc Mail Returned Mon 04/19 3:01 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re26 . Mail sent to Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Fri 03/19 1:38 PM
ORDER by Judge Benjamin Beaton on March 19, 2021. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' motion for remand [DN19 ] as untimely under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). cc: Counsel, Plaintiff (pro se) (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
25 25 respm Response Mon 03/15 10:25 AM
RESPONSE to re19 Notice (Other) filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Ekman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Kentucky Commission on Human Rights Motion,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 12, 2021
24 24 order Order Referring Motion - TEXT ONLY Fri 03/12 8:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court refers Defendant Kentucky Commission on Human Rights Motion to Dismiss DN8 , Defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development's Motion to Dismiss DN11 ), and Defendant Louisville Legal Aid Society's Motion to Dismiss DN12 to Magistrate Judge Edwards under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) for consideration and preparation of a Report and Recommendation. Magistrate Judge Edwards is authorized to conduct any hearings necessary for resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, RSE (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/09 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF FILING various receipts by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/09 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING various receipts by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 03/05 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/03 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF FILING receipts by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/03 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF FILING Certified Mailings by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/22 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF FILING RECEIPTS by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/10 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF FILING by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/03 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF TENDERED SUBPOENA by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/01 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF FILING various letters/docs by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of letter to the Kentucky Commission of Human Rights,
Att: 2 Copy of letter to Stuart Pope, Legal Aid Attorney,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Friday, January 29, 2021
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/01 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
13 13 misc Letter Thu 01/28 3:24 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Cecil Calhoun. (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 01/27 12:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Louisville Legal Aid Society (Evans, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Time Entries,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/27 4:17 PM
TEXT ORDER by Judge Benjamin Beaton on 1/27/2021. Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (KD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
11 11 motion Dismiss Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 01/26 9:05 AM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Ekman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 21, 2021
10 10 motion Hearing Fri 01/22 8:04 AM
MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Cecil Calhoun (JM)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Fri 01/22 8:04 AM
Letter from Plaintiff Cecil Calhoun. (JM)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/21 2:21 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Kentucky Commission on Human Rights (Sells, Colt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-State Court Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-State Court Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/21 10:17 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Ekman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/21 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits, by plaintiff Cecil Calhoun. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2 of 3,
Att: 2 Part 3 of 3
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/20 2:54 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/20/2021. District Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings RECUSES from this matter and the action is reassigned to the docket of District Judge Benjamin J. Beaton, United States District Court Judge, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the Civil action number to reflect the initials BJB on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel, BB-CM (SMJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Mail Returned Wed 01/20 2:44 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 /2 /3 . Mail sent to Cecil Calhoun. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/28 11:40 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal.cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court Clerk (SRH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
2 2 utility Case Assignment Mon 12/28 11:38 AM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 12/28 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-04496. (SRH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet