California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 1:11-bk-15025
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Jun 02, 2011
Terminated:Nov 08, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Dec 19, 2011
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 01, 2011

Debtor
David A. Cates
PO Box 20851
Bakersfield, CA 93390-0851
Represented By
T. Scott Belden
contact info
Jacob L. Eaton
contact info
Debtor
Linda A. Cates
Post Office Box 20851
Bakersfield, CA 93390
Represented By
T. Scott Belden
contact info
Jacob L. Eaton
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
United States Courthouse 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1401
Fresno, CA 93721
U.S. Trustee
August B. Landis
Represented By
Robin S. Tubesing
contact info

GPO Dec 19 2011
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law [KDG-6] Re: 135 Amended/Modified Plan (crof)

Docket last updated: 11/08/2016 12:00 PM PST
Friday, April 29, 2011
Case participants added via Case Upload.
Related: [-]
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,039.00, Receipt Number: 1 11-07466 (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Missing Document(s): Schedule I - Current Income; Schedule J - Current Expend.; Statement of Financial Affairs; Means Test - Form 22B; Attorney's Disclosure Stmt.; Document(s) due by 05/13/2011.
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Related [+]
Related: [-] sf
3 3 Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
4 4 Statement of Social Security Number(s) Related [+]
Related: [-] sf
5 5 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Related [+]
Related: [-] sf
6 6 Request by U.S. Trustee to Send 341 Notice; Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/2/2011 at 12:30 PM at Bakersfield Meeting Room. Last day to oppose discharge: 8/1/2011. Proofs of Claim due by 8/31/2011. (hgof)
Related: [-]
7 7 Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Citizens Business Bank (crof)
Related: [-]
7 7 Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Citizens Business Bank (crof)
Related: [-]
8 8 Request to Receive Electronic Notification Filed by U.S. Trustee August B. Landis (crof)
Related: [-]
9 9 Certificate/Proof of Service of7 Request for Special Notice,7 Request for Special Notice (crof)
Related: [-]