New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:20-cv-06300
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2020
Terminated:Apr 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 26, 2021 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Sterling Equities
Represented By
Matthew Adam Steinberg
Akerman LLP
contact info
Andrew C. Karter
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tawana Johnson
28 Davis Street
Roosevelt, NY 11575


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 07, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/07 10:11 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the settlement in principle this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to its reinstatement should the settlement not be consummated. Barring any further requests for an extension within 90 days of this order, this dismissal shall deemed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/7/2022. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
25 25 misc Letter Wed 04/06 1:46 PM
Letter regarding settlement agreement by Sterling Equities (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
24 24 misc Letter Fri 03/04 10:33 AM
Letter pursuant to Your Honors Order dated February 17, 2022, enclosing correspondence and proof of delivery by Sterling Equities (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/17 11:20 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re23 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply requesting a forty-five (45) day extension of time from February 25, 2022 through and including April 11, 2022, to reply to pro se Plaintiff Tawana Johnsons opposition to Defendant's Motion. Defendant shall serve the Reply on Plaintiff and file the fully briefed motion by April 12, 2022. Counsel for Defendant is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and file proof of delivery with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/17/2022. (Mistry-Sehgal, Nikita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/09 4:57 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply requesting a forty-five (45) day extension of time from February 25, 2022 through and including April 11, 2022, to reply to pro se plaintiff Tawana Johnsons opposition to Sterlings Motion to Dismiss by Sterling Equities. (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, December 30, 2021
22 22 service Affidavit of Service Thu 12/30 12:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter motion dated December 29, 2021 and Electronic Order dated December 30, 2021 served on Tawana Johnson on 12/30/2021, filed by Sterling Equities. (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/30 10:30 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re21 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Sterling's Motion to Dismiss served on Plaintiff on July 30, 2021 . The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to February 4, 2022. Fully briefed motion to be filed by February 25, 2022. No further extensions of Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss will be granted. Counsel for Defendant is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and file proof of delivery with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/30/2021. (White, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/29 4:58 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Sterling's Motion to Dismiss served on Plaintiff on July 30, 2021 by Sterling Equities. (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/02 5:48 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendant's Motion to Dismiss . The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to January 4, 2022 and Plaintiff's reply is due by January 18, 2022. The Fully briefed motion to be filed by January 25, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/2/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/02 2:45 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Tawana Johnson. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
19 19 misc Letter Fri 10/29 1:08 PM
Letter to pro se plaintiff Tawana Johnson from the Pro Se Department returning document without docketing or consideration. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/24 10:51 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendant's Motion to Dismiss . The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to November 4, 2021. Fully briefed motion to be filed by November 25, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/24/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/24 9:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Tawana Johnson. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
17 17 misc Letter Wed 09/08 12:36 PM
Letter pursuant to Your Honors Order dated September 7, 2021, enclosing correspondence and proof of delivery by Sterling Equities (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter to Tawana Johnson,
Att: 2 Proof of Delivery
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/07 6:23 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply .Plaintiff shall send the response to Defendant by October 4, 2021; Defendant shall serve the Reply on Plaintiff and file the fully briefed motion by October 17, 2021. Counsel for Defendant is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and file proof of delivery with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/7/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/03 11:24 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Tawana Johnson. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 06/28 10:43 AM
ORDER denying15 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Defendants Letter Motion for a pre motion conference15 is denied as unnecessary. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendants Motion to Dismiss: (1) Defendant shall serve, but not file, a copy of the Motion to Dismiss on Plaintiff by July 30, 2021; Plaintiff shall send the response to Defendant by September 3, 2021; Defendant shall serve the Reply on Plaintiff and file the fully briefed motion by September 17, 2021. Pursuant to the Courts Individual Practice Rules, no motion papers shall be filed until the motion is fully briefed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/28/2021. (DeSaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
order Order(Other) Tue 04/13 10:15 AM
ORDER re15 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re1 Complaint filed by Sterling Equities. Defendants motion for a pre-motion conference, or in the alternative a briefing schedule, for defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the motion itself is respectfully referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/13/2021. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
15 15 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 04/09 3:34 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re1 Complaint by Sterling Equities. (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/09 3:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Equities (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
13 13 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/01 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sterling Equities re10 Notice of Appearance,9 Notice of Appearance (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/30 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tawana Johnson. Sterling Equities served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email Fri 03/26 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Change of address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/25 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Adam Steinberg on behalf of Sterling Equities (aty to be noticed) (Steinberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/25 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Karter on behalf of Sterling Equities (aty to be noticed) (Karter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
8 8 misc Letter Tue 03/09 10:59 AM
Letter to pro se plaintiff Tawana Johnson from the Pro Se Department enclosing official stamped summons along with instructions on the service of the summons and complaint. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
7 7 order Order(Other) Mon 02/22 4:00 PM
ORDER re Rule 4(m) - Accordingly, if service is not made upon the defendant by 3/29/2021, or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is to provide a copy of this Order to the defendant along with the summons and complaint and shall file proof of service with the Court. Plaintiff is required to advise the Clerk of Court of any changes of address. Failure to keep the court informed of plaintiff's current address may result in dismissal f the case. Although plaintiff paid the fee to commence this action, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se plaintiff. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/22/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 02/17 12:28 PM
FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 30712 (Cox, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/04 12:43 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied and she is directed to pay the $402.00 filing fee within 14 days of the date of this Order or the action will be dismissed without prejudice. This Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3) that, should Plaintiff seek leave to appeal in forma pauperis, any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se plaintiff at her address of record. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/4/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/11 12:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tawana Johnson. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
4 4 misc Letter Wed 01/06 9:20 AM
Letter from Pro Se Office acknowledging receipt of civil action and informing litigant of docket number and Judge assigned. CM 1/6/21 (Grady, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 12/29 3:07 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficient Filing Tue 12/29 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING , litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days . re:1 Complaint. The papers are deficient as a filing fee of $402 is required in order to commence a civil action. Alternatively, you may request to proceed in forma pauperis by completing the enclosed IFP application. C/M to litigant on 12/29/20. (Cox, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/29 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Sterling Equities Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Tawana Johnson. (Cox, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet